Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB964 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 964
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 6, 2025, rereferred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 964 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appearance of a personal identification certificate
 or driver's license issued to a person who is not a citizen of the
 United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.1017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.1017.  DESIGNATOR ON CERTIFICATE ISSUED TO
 NONCITIZEN. A personal identification certificate issued to a
 person who is not a citizen of the United States must:
 (1)  orient the information on the certificate to
 clearly distinguish the certificate from a personal identification
 certificate issued to a person who is a citizen; and
 (2)  display the phrase "NOT ELIGIBLE TO VOTE" on the
 front of the certificate in the same font size as the individual's
 personal identification certificate number.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.1231 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.1231.  DESIGNATOR ON LICENSE ISSUED TO NONCITIZEN.
 A driver's license issued to an applicant who is not a citizen of
 the United States must:
 (1)  orient the information on the license vertically,
 regardless of the age of the applicant, to clearly distinguish the
 license from a driver's license issued to a person who is a citizen;
 and
 (2)  display the phrase "NOT ELIGIBLE TO VOTE" on the
 front of the license in the same font size as the individual's
 driver's license number.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a personal identification certificate or driver's license issued or
 renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A personal
 identification certificate or driver's license issued or renewed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the license or certificate was issued or renewed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *