Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB987 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt, Birdwell S.B. No. 987
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; March 17, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the subject matter jurisdiction of the criminal trial
 courts of this state over certain criminal actions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 571.171, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  This section does not require the exhaustion of civil,
 including administrative, remedies as a prerequisite to the vesting
 in a trial court of subject matter jurisdiction over a criminal
 action for which the trial court would otherwise have jurisdiction
 under other law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies to a criminal action commenced
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *