Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB993 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 993
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a peace officer commissioned by the
 comptroller to apply for an order authorizing the installation and
 use of a mobile tracking device.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 18B.202(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A district judge may issue an order for the installation
 and use of a mobile tracking device only on the application of:
 (1)  an authorized peace officer; or
 (2)  a peace officer commissioned by the comptroller.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *