Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB996 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 01/29/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 996     89R9078 PRL-D   By: Nichols         Local Government         3/21/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   On July 4, 2026, the United States will celebrate the semiquincentennial anniversary of American Independence Day. Current statute only permits Texans to purchase fireworks from June 24 until 11:59 p.m. on July 4. Because July 4, 2026, falls on a Saturday, Texans would only be able to purchase fireworks for half of the weekend in accordance with state law.   S.B. 996 amends this by allowing the purchasing of fireworks to be extended until 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026, so that Texans may be able to celebrate 250 years of American independence for the entire weekend. This addition to the Occupations Code is only applicable for the year 2026, and would not affect the sale of fireworks on American Independence Day at any other time.    As proposed, S.B. 996 amends current law relating to fireworks sales to the public by retail fireworks permit holders on certain dates.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 2154.202, Occupations Code, by adding Subsection (g-1), as follows:   (g-1) Provides that a retail fireworks permit holder, notwithstanding Subsection (g) (relating to providing that a retail fireworks permit holder is authorized to sell fireworks only to the public, and only during certain periods), is authorized to sell fireworks only to the public during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2026.    SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center S.B. 996
89R9078 PRL-D By: Nichols
 Local Government
 3/21/2025
 As Filed



Senate Research Center

S.B. 996

89R9078 PRL-D

By: Nichols

Local Government

3/21/2025

As Filed

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

On July 4, 2026, the United States will celebrate the semiquincentennial anniversary of American Independence Day. Current statute only permits Texans to purchase fireworks from June 24 until 11:59 p.m. on July 4. Because July 4, 2026, falls on a Saturday, Texans would only be able to purchase fireworks for half of the weekend in accordance with state law.

S.B. 996 amends this by allowing the purchasing of fireworks to be extended until 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026, so that Texans may be able to celebrate 250 years of American independence for the entire weekend. This addition to the Occupations Code is only applicable for the year 2026, and would not affect the sale of fireworks on American Independence Day at any other time.

As proposed, S.B. 996 amends current law relating to fireworks sales to the public by retail fireworks permit holders on certain dates.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends Section 2154.202, Occupations Code, by adding Subsection (g-1), as follows:

(g-1) Provides that a retail fireworks permit holder, notwithstanding Subsection (g) (relating to providing that a retail fireworks permit holder is authorized to sell fireworks only to the public, and only during certain periods), is authorized to sell fireworks only to the public during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59 p.m. on July 5, 2026. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2026.

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2025.