Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB996 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 996
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fireworks sales to the public by retail fireworks
 permit holders on certain dates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2154.202, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows:
 (g-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (g), a retail fireworks
 permit holder may sell fireworks only to the public during the
 period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on July 5, 2026, and ending at 11:59
 p.m. on July 5, 2026.  This subsection expires September 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *