Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/19/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.C.R. No. 16




 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 17, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 provides that neither house of the legislature may adjourn for more
 than three days without the consent of the other house; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 each house grant the other permission to adjourn for more than three
 days during the period beginning on Thursday, February 20, 2025,
 and ending on Tuesday, February 25, 2025.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 16 was adopted by the Senate
 on February 18, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 16 was adopted by the House
 on February 19, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 21,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State