Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR11 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 11
 In Memory
 of
 Larry Beauchamp
 WHEREAS, The passing of Larry Lyndon Beauchamp of Lawn on
 December 26, 2024, at the age of 86, concluded a remarkable life
 of service to the law enforcement community and to the State of
 Texas; and
 WHEREAS, The youngest child of P. G. and Bertie Beauchamp,
 Larry Beauchamp was born in Terry County on March 4, 1938, and he
 grew up with four siblings, P. G., James, Ada, and Joyce;
 following his graduation from Rochester High School, he
 exchanged wedding vows with his childhood sweetheart, the former
 Frankie Jo Sherley, on June 30, 1956; the couple shared a
 rewarding marriage that spanned 68 years, raising two children,
 James and John, and welcoming five grandchildren and four
 great-grandchildren into their treasured family; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Beauchamp began his 35-year law enforcement
 career with the Brownfield Police Department; after spending more
 than a decade there, he was stationed with the U.S. Army military
 police in Colorado, in Georgia, and at Fort Bliss in El Paso; he went
 on to serve as chief of the New Braunfels Police Department and as
 chief of legislative and capitol security for the Texas State Capitol
 complex; in addition, he was an investigator with the Texas Board of
 Investigators in Midland, the Haskell County District Attorney's
 Office, and the Travis County District Attorney's Office public
 integrity unit; he later served as an assistant commissioner with the
 Texas Department of Agriculture and as a construction manager with the
 Texas Veterans Land Board; a graduate of the Federal Bureau of
 Investigation National Academy, he distinguished himself over the
 years by earning a reputation for his commitment to professional
 development and ethical standards; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man and a dedicated public
 servant, Larry Beauchamp is deeply missed, but the integrity with
 which he lived his life will forever inspire all who had the good
 fortune to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State Of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Larry Lyndon
 Beauchamp and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Frankie Jo Beauchamp; to his sons, James Lyndon
 Beauchamp and John Presley Beauchamp; to his grandchildren, Kourtney
 Amelia Schopper, Caleigh Rea Popp, and Presley Suresh, Nila Jo, and
 Kareena Lyndon Beauchamp; to his great-grandchildren, Suzette and
 Betty Schopper and Pearl and Silas Popp; to his sisters, Ada Ruth Pope
 and Joyce Arlene Hester; and to his many other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Larry Beauchamp.
 Perry
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 28, 2025, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate