Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR143 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/24/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R14999 JRI-F
 By: Huffman S.R. No. 143




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of Texas in remembering the life and legacy of Medal of Honor
 recipient Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez and the loaning of his
 Medal of Honor to the new National Medal of Honor Museum in
 Arlington; and
 WHEREAS, A native Texan, Master Sergeant Benavidez was born
 on August 5, 1935, in Lindenau, the son of a sharecropper; orphaned
 at an early age and raised by relatives, he dropped out of school at
 the age of 14 to work in the fields before enlisting in the U.S. Army
 in June 1955; and
 WHEREAS, While on his first tour of duty in Vietnam, this
 admirable soldier was injured by a land mine, and though doctors
 feared he might never walk again, Master Sergeant Benavidez
 recovered fully and returned to Vietnam with the Green Berets, an
 elite Special Forces unit; and
 WHEREAS, On the morning of May 2, 1968, while assigned to the
 Loc Ninh base in South Vietnam, then-Sergeant Benavidez learned
 that 12 members of a Special Forces reconnaissance team were
 surrounded by enemy troops inside Cambodia and under heavy fire;
 this heroic Texan courageously volunteered for the evacuation
 mission to aid in the rescue of his fellow soldiers; and
 WHEREAS, Though intense small-arms and antiaircraft fire
 made the rescue operation tremendously dangerous, Sergeant
 Benavidez jumped from the helicopter into enemy gunsights; even
 before he reached the stranded team's position, he had been wounded
 in his right leg, face, and head, yet despite his painful injuries,
 Sergeant Benavidez carried the wounded men to the waiting
 helicopter and provided protective fire to cover the remaining
 crew; and
 WHEREAS, The mission grew more complicated as Sergeant
 Benavidez retrieved classified documents from dead and wounded team
 members, and he worked quickly to secure them despite sustaining
 more severe wounds from gunshots to his abdomen and grenade
 fragments in his back; while attempting takeoff, the pilot was
 mortally wounded, and the helicopter crashed; despite the chaos
 around him, Sergeant Benavidez freed those aboard from the wreckage
 and established a defensive perimeter under increasing enemy
 gunfire and grenade attacks; and
 WHEREAS, Acting as a medic, directing by radio the fire from
 gunships overhead, and even engaging in hand-to-hand combat with
 the enemy, Sergeant Benavidez bravely weathered a harrowing six
 hours in hell and saved the lives of eight men through his
 leadership and action; he had been clubbed, shot, and bayoneted,
 yet Sergeant Benavidez prevailed, and when his actions were praised
 as awesome and extraordinary, he defined them only as duty; and
 WHEREAS, For his exceptional valor, Sergeant Benavidez was
 awarded the Distinguished Service Cross; then on February 24, 1981,
 44 years ago today, Master Sergeant (Ret.) Roy P. Benavidez was
 presented with the Congressional Medal of Honor by President Ronald
 Reagan; and
 WHEREAS, Even after his retirement from the military, he
 continued to serve his country by devoting his time and energy to
 veterans groups and by visiting schools to speak to youths on
 critical issues such as courage, commitment, education, faith,
 patriotism, and staying away from drug use and gangs; and
 WHEREAS, Though this brave soldier died on November 29, 1998,
 his widow Hilaria "Lala" Coy Benavidez and their three children,
 son Noel and daughters Yvette and Denise, have carried on Master
 Sergeant Benavidez's legacy by remaining active in their community
 with various civic organizations and volunteering their time with
 the Boy Scouts of America, which paved the way for six of Master
 Sergeant Benavidez's grandsons to earn the rank of Eagle Scout; and
 WHEREAS, On February 6, 2011, the late Hilaria "Lala" Coy
 Benavidez generously loaned her husband's Medal of Honor to the
 Ronald Regan Presidential Library in Simi Valley, California, where
 it was on display for tens of thousands of museum visitors to see
 and learn about the life and legacy of Master Sergeant Roy P.
 Benavidez; and
 WHEREAS, On January 3, 2025, the children of Master Sergeant
 Roy P. Benavidez traveled to the Ronald Reagan Presidential Library
 to take part in a handoff ceremony, which consisted of the Ronald
 Reagan Presidential Library handing over Master Sergeant Roy
 P. Benavidez's Medal of Honor to his three children so that it can
 return home to Texas; and
 WHEREAS, The children of Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez
 have generously loaned their father's Medal of Honor to the new
 National Medal of Honor Museum in Arlington, where it will be one of
 several Medals of Honor from living and deceased recipients that
 have been either donated or loaned to the new museum and will be on
 display for the public to see; and
 WHEREAS, A deserving recipient of the highest and most
 prestigious military decoration of valor, Roy Benavidez
 demonstrated extraordinary courage in the line of duty, and he will
 forever be remembered with great admiration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 89th Texas Legislature
 hereby pay tribute to the life and legacy of Master Sergeant Roy
 P. Benavidez and extend to his family sincere appreciation for
 their generosity in sharing his inspiring story with others; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family as an expression of deepest gratitude from
 the Texas Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez and his wife Lala.