Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR453 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/29/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 453
 In Memory
 of
 Stanley C. Parker
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Stanley C. Parker, who died
 September 15, 2024, at the age of 65; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Waco, Stan Parker was born
 April 28, 1959; he graduated from Richfield High School, and he
 married Valerie Prewett, his high school sweetheart, on
 August 16, 1980; and
 WHEREAS, Stan found professional success as an
 entrepreneur, but he was better known by his passion for
 philanthropy and service to veterans; in 2017, he established the
 Stan C. Parker Foundation to provide advocacy, education, and
 resources to citizens in need, and the organization has supported
 hundreds of local veterans through initiatives such as the annual
 Waco Veterans Parade and the establishment of Freedom's Path
 Waco, a housing project for homeless veterans set to be completed
 in late 2025; and
 WHEREAS, A dedicated Freemason, Stan held numerous
 leadership positions during his decades of service and
 membership in the organization, and he was proud to hold the
 highest honors in the Scottish and York Rites; and
 WHEREAS, Stan and Valerie shared 44 rewarding years of
 marriage together; he was a devoted father to their children, Austin
 and Jessica, and his two grandchildren enriched his life
 immeasurably; and
 WHEREAS, An avid outdoorsman, Stan enjoyed hunting,
 barbecuing, archaeology, and restoring classic cars; he was an
 esteemed member of the Waco community, and he will long be
 remembered with admiration and appreciation by all who were
 privileged to share in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Stanley C. Parker; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Stan Parker.
 Birdwell
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 28, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate