Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR461 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 461
 In Memory
 of
 Charles Cosper
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with
 the passing of Charles Floyd Cosper of Hereford on Sunday,
 April 7, 2024, at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Virgil Cosper and the former Roxie
 Sherman, Chuck Cosper was born in Paducah on February 15, 1939, and
 grew up with a sister, Janette, and brother, Bobby; he graduated
 from the Texas Game Warden Training Academy at Texas A&M University
 before embarking on a career as a game warden that spanned three
 decades; he was also a pilot who worked from Friona Airport as a
 crop sprayer and flight instructor; and
 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. Cosper was a longtime
 deacon at First Baptist Church and a member of the Texas Baptist Men
 Retiree Builders for 14 years; along the way, he served as
 president of Hereford Kids Inc. and the Hereford Booster Club, and
 he was an enthusiastic supporter of Hereford High School athletics,
 proudly earning recognition as the Fan of the Week; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Cosper met his wife, Sue, in the seventh
 grade; the couple married on November 15, 1957, and went on to
 share a rewarding union that spanned 66 years; they became the
 parents of four children, Pam, Ken, Vickie, and Larry, and their
 family eventually grew to include 7 grandchildren and 12
 great-grandchildren; an avid outdoorsman, Mr. Cosper took
 pleasure in hunting, fishing, playing golf, and snow skiing; he
 also loved to chat with friends over an afternoon coffee; and
 WHEREAS, Chuck Cosper earned the admiration and affection
 of innumerable people, and although he is deeply missed, his
 commitment to his family and his community remains a source of
 inspiration to all who were fortunate enough to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Charles Floyd
 Cosper and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Sue Cosper; to his children, Pam Boren and her
 husband, Jay, Ken Cosper and his wife, Markay, and Vickie Young
 and her husband, Darren; to his grandchildren, Heath Boren and
 his wife, Kim, J. W. Boren and his wife, Belinda, Nathan Young and
 his wife, Alyson, Jarrod Young and his wife, Katie, and Abbey,
 Jack, and Sam Cosper; to his great-grandchildren, Colby, Ava,
 Lilly, Brock, Emory, Isaiah, Zeke, Slade, Saylor, Sloane, Ellie,
 and Jake; to his sister, Janette Abraham, and her husband, Greg;
 and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Chuck Cosper.
 Sparks
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 28, 2025, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate