Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR506 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/08/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 9 2025 4:07PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Reported enrolled: May 9 2025 6:35PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 8 2025 7:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Received from the Senate
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Reported enrolled: May 9 2025 6:37PM