LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
Local & Consent Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR451
Honoring the Missouri City Mayor's Youth Commission.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR453
Recognizing April 29, 2025, as Jack County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR450
In memory of Princella Jewel Vogel of Houston.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR521
Recognizing March 25, 2025, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR522
In memory of Dr. Alice Gayle Hudgens of Hays.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR523
In memory of Dr. Audwin LaBarron Anderson.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR524
In memory of Rafael "Ralph" Gonzales Jr. of San Marcos.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR557
Recognizing Julio's Seasoning & Corn Chips in Del Rio.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR528
Honoring the Reverend Marvin Joe Moore and Sister Mildred Ann Moore for their 50 years of pastoral service at First Church Bay City.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR527
Congratulating Chief David Langenberg of Humble Fire Rescue on being named a 2025 Public Official of the Year by the University of Houston MPA program.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR481
Honoring President Richard C. Benson for his service to The University of Texas at Dallas and the field of higher education.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR482
Honoring Winfred A. Simmons for his contributions as a school athletics coach.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR483
Recognizing March 31, 2025, as House District 76 Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR484
Recognizing March 12, 2025, as Wholesale Beer Distributors of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR485
Recognizing March 26, 2025, as Texas Pharmacy Day at the State Capitol.
Page 37 of 58
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46