Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 5, 2025, and ending on Tuesday, February 11, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12

Urging Congress to amend the Internal Revenue Code to make spaceports eligible for tax-exempt private activity bonds.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13

Urging the U.S. Department of State and the United States Section of the International Boundary and Water Commission to take appropriate action to ensure that Mexico complies with the 1944 Treaty regarding shared water resources.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR14

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning Thursday, February 13, 2025, and ending Tuesday, February 18, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Designating Brenham as the official Ice Cream Capital of Texas for a 10-year period ending in 2035.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning Thursday, February 20, 2025, and ending Tuesday, February 25, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR17

Designating the fourth Thursday of March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Designating the Town of Trophy Club as the official Texas Town of Patriotism for a 10-year period ending in 2035.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

Authorizing the State Preservation Board to approve the construction of a Texas Life Monument at the State Capitol Complex.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2

Designating April as Texas Silver-Haired Legislature Month for a 10-year period ending in 2035.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, February 27, 2025, and ending on Tuesday, March 4, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

In memory of Edwin Elmer Perryman of Tyler.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Designating the cannon as the official state gun of Texas.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Designating the first full week in April as Gifted and Talented Students Week for a 10-year period ending in 2035.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Expressing support for the strengthening of our partnership with Israel and for the creation of a Texas Trade and Investment Office in Israel.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records