Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR18

In memory of Michael Shannon Ewing of Austin.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR180

Recognizing March 4, 2025, as Nurse Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR181

Congratulating Garrett Lane Mills on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR182

Congratulating Clayton Ross Newman on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR183

Congratulating William Paxton Henke on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR184

Recognizing the Court Appointed Special Advocates of Central Texas on the occasion of its 40th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR185

Commemorating the 189th anniversary of the adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence on March 2, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR186

Recognizing Montgomery Independent School District on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR187

Recognizing March 4, 2025, as Montgomery County Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR188

In memory of L. Clifford Davis of Tarrant County.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR189

Recognizing 125 years of Black aviation history.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR19

Recognizing February 4, 2025, as Houston East End Chamber of Commerce East End Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR190

Recognizing March 5, 2025, as City of Alamo Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR191

In memory of Johnny Canales.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR192

Recognizing February 19, 2025, as Audubon Texas Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records