Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR260

Recognizing the members of the Extracorporeal Membrane Oxygenation team at Children's Health.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR261

Recognizing March 19, 2025, as Ellis County Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR262

Recognizing Texas State University's Mariachi Nueva Generacin for earning first prize in the university division of the 2024 Mariachi Extravaganza.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR263

Recognizing Texas State University on the occasion of its 125th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR264

Recognizing the Supreme Court ruling in Gideon v. Wainwright on the occasion of its 62nd anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR265

Recognizing March 21, 2025, as World Down Syndrome Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR266

Congratulating the Texas Rangers for winning a Major League Baseball World Series Championship in 2023.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR267

Extending best wishes to all those participating in the festivities of Holi.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR268

Expressing support for the protection of COFA islanders residing in Texas, reaffirming their rights afforded under the Compacts of Free Association, and recognizing March 18, 2025, as COFA Day in Texas.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR269

Recognizing March 19, 2025, as Palmview Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR27

Recognizing February 4, 2025, as McAllen Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR270

Recognizing March 18, 2025, as Omega Psi Phi Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR271

Recognizing March 17, 2025, as Profound Autism Awareness Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR272

Recognizing the Boys & Girls Clubs of the Concho Valley on the occasion of its 60th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR273

Recognizing the Lubbock Monterey Chapter of AMBUCS on the occasion of its Visibility Month.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records