Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR300

In memory of Lamar Oslin Lewis of Temple.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR301

Recognizing New Braunfels Noon Lions Club on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR302

In memory of Richard Harold Meyer of Calhoun County.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR303

Recognizing March 20, 2025, as Calhoun County Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR304

Recognizing March 20 and 21, 2025, as Texas Federation of Republican Women Days.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR305

In memory of Jill Diane Warrington Glover.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR306

Recognizing March 19, 2025, as Texas Small Business Development Center Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR307

Recognizing March 24 through 30, 2025, as National Area Health Education Center Week.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR308

Recognizing the dedication of the Official Texas Historical Marker for Oakland Cemetery.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR309

Recognizing Fred Cant for his exemplary career in broadcasting.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR31

Recognizing February 3, 2025, as 9-1-1 Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR310

Recognizing March 25, 2025, as Johnson County Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR311

Recognizing March 27, 2025, as CASA Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR312

Recognizing Sergio Vasquez, Jesus Gonzalez, and Charlie Cavazos for assisting in fighting the 2025 wildfires in California.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR313

Recognizing March 25, 2025, as Paws Fur Help Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records