Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR409

Recognizing April 15, 2025, as Blue Ribbon Lobby Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR41

Recognizing February 11, 2025, as Jacksonville Leadership Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR410

Recognizing Alyssa Barrera Mason for her service to the City of Corpus Christi.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR411

In memory of Guadalupe Arismendez Jr. of Corpus Christi.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR412

Recognizing April 16, 2025, as Whataburger Wednesday.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR413

In memory of Earl M. Swindle Sr. of Houston.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR414

Recognizing St. Francis Xavier Catholic Church Day at the State Capitol on April 16, 2025.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR415

Recognizing Walter Miller on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR416

Recognizing the intern cohort of Dean Senator Zaffirini for their service during the 89th Legislative Session.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR417

Recognizing May 6, 2025 as Golf Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR418

Recognizing April 17, 2025, as The University of Texas Arlington Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR419

In memory of Reuben Booker Harrison.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR42

Recognizing February 12, 2025, as Coastal Bend Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR420

In memory of Louise Mauro Strauch.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR421

Recognizing Blue Branch Historic Ranch and Anxiety Solutions of America for their work on behalf of veterans and first responders.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records