Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate 2025 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR9

Recognizing January 29, 2025, as Texas American Public Works Association Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR90

Recognizing Harmony Public Schools on the occasion of its 25th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR91

Recognizing February 11, 2025, as Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR92

Recognizing February 19, 2025, as Lubbock Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR93

Congratulating Ann Manning of Lubbock on receiving a Distinguished Alumni Award.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR94

Recognizing February 13, 2025, as Uvalde County Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR95

Recognizing the Richardson Chamber of Commerce Austin Legislative Fly-In on February 18 and 19, 2025, at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR96

Recognizing certified registered nurse anesthetists in Texas.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR97

Recognizing February 18, 2025, as Prairie View A&M University Day.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR98

Recognizing Senator Judith Zaffirini on the occasion of her birthday.
TX

Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR99

Recognizing February 19, 2025, as Texas Chapter of the American College of Physicians Advocacy Leadership Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records