Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB1435 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/22/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 1435 
To amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination of the sale of 
internal combustion engines. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH8, 2023 
Mr. J
OYCEof Pennsylvania (for himself, Mr. LATTA, Mr. BILIRAKIS, Mr. 
O
BERNOLTE, Mr. EMMER, Ms. STEFANIK, Mr. CURTIS, Mr. POSEY, Mr. 
B
ALDERSON, Mr. RESCHENTHALER, Mr. PFLUGER, Mr. ROY, Mr. MIL-
LERof Ohio, Ms. VANDUYNE, Mr. FINSTAD, Mr. NEHLS, Mr. MAST, 
Mr. P
ENCE, Mr. WITTMAN, Mr. GOODENof Texas, Mr. ARMSTRONG, Mr. 
J
OHNSONof Ohio, Mr. JACKSONof Texas, Mr. ISSA, Mrs. BOEBERT, Mr. 
G
UEST, Mr. ELLZEY, Mr. WEBERof Texas, Mr. SMITHof New Jersey, 
Mr. H
IGGINSof Louisiana, Mr. HUDSON, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. CARTER 
of Georgia, Mr. S
MITHof Missouri, Mr. BOST, Mrs. HARSHBARGER, Mr. 
F
EENSTRA, Mr. WILLIAMSof Texas, Mr. DONALDS, Mr. OWENS, Mr. 
W
ALBERG, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. AUSTINSCOTTof Georgia, Mr. 
G
RIFFITH, Mr. MCCORMICK, Mrs. BICE, Mr. STAUBER, Mr. ALLEN, Mr. 
L
AMALFA, Mr. HERN, Mr. KELLYof Pennsylvania, Mr. LATURNER, Mr. 
D
UNCAN, Mr. TURNER, Mr. BURGESS, Mr. WENSTRUP, Mr. MANN, Mr. 
S
MUCKER, Mr. PERRY, and Mr. CAREY) introduced the following bill; 
which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce 
A BILL 
To amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination 
of the sale of internal combustion engines. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:19 Mar 21, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1435.IH H1435
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 1435 IH
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Preserving Choice in 2
Vehicle Purchases Act’’. 3
SEC. 2. STATE STANDARDS. 4
(a) A
MENDMENTS.—Section 209(b) of the Clean Air 5
Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)) is amended— 6
(1) in paragraph (1)— 7
(A) in subparagraph (B), by striking the 8
‘‘or’’ at the end; 9
(B) in subparagraph (C), by striking 10
‘‘part.’’ and inserting ‘‘part, or’’; and 11
(C) by adding at the end the following: 12
‘‘(D) such State standards directly or indirectly 13
limit the sale or use of new motor vehicles with in-14
ternal combustion engines, as such term is defined 15
in section 63.9375 of title 40, Code of Federal Reg-16
ulations, as in effect January 1, 2023.’’; and 17
(2) by adding at the end the following: 18
‘‘(4) The Administrator may not determine that any 19
State standards amended after the date of enactment of 20
this paragraph are within the scope of a waiver granted 21
under paragraph (1) before the date of enactment of this 22
paragraph.’’. 23
(b) E
FFECT ONCERTAINEXISTINGWAIVERS.—The 24
Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency 25
shall revoke a waiver granted under section 209(b) of the 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:19 Mar 21, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1435.IH H1435
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 1435 IH
Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)) during the period that 1
begins on January 1, 2022, and ends on the date of enact-2
ment of this Act if the Administrator finds that such waiv-3
er does not comply with subparagraph (D) of section 4
209(b)(1) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)(1)), 5
as added by this Act. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:19 Mar 21, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1435.IH H1435
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS