Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB1435 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/02/2023

                    IB 
Union Calendar No. 133 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 1435 
[Report No. 118–169] 
To amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination of the sale of 
internal combustion engines. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH8, 2023 
Mr. J
OYCEof Pennsylvania (for himself, Mr. LATTA, Mr. BILIRAKIS, Mr. 
O
BERNOLTE, Mr. EMMER, Ms. STEFANIK, Mr. CURTIS, Mr. POSEY, Mr. 
B
ALDERSON, Mr. RESCHENTHALER, Mr. PFLUGER, Mr. ROY, Mr. MIL-
LERof Ohio, Ms. VANDUYNE, Mr. FINSTAD, Mr. NEHLS, Mr. MAST, 
Mr. P
ENCE, Mr. WITTMAN, Mr. GOODENof Texas, Mr. ARMSTRONG, Mr. 
J
OHNSONof Ohio, Mr. JACKSONof Texas, Mr. ISSA, Mrs. BOEBERT, Mr. 
G
UEST, Mr. ELLZEY, Mr. WEBERof Texas, Mr. SMITHof New Jersey, 
Mr. H
IGGINSof Louisiana, Mr. HUDSON, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. CARTER 
of Georgia, Mr. S
MITHof Missouri, Mr. BOST, Mrs. HARSHBARGER, Mr. 
F
EENSTRA, Mr. WILLIAMSof Texas, Mr. DONALDS, Mr. OWENS, Mr. 
W
ALBERG, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. AUSTINSCOTTof Georgia, Mr. 
G
RIFFITH, Mr. MCCORMICK, Mrs. BICE, Mr. STAUBER, Mr. ALLEN, Mr. 
L
AMALFA, Mr. HERN, Mr. KELLYof Pennsylvania, Mr. LATURNER, Mr. 
D
UNCAN, Mr. TURNER, Mr. BURGESS, Mr. WENSTRUP, Mr. MANN, Mr. 
S
MUCKER, Mr. PERRY, and Mr. CAREY) introduced the following bill; 
which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce 
S
EPTEMBER1, 2023 
Additional sponsors: Ms. T
ENNEY, Mrs. STEEL, Mr. HUNT, Mr. EDWARDS, 
Mr. F
ULCHER, Mr. BUCSHON, Mrs. FISCHBACH, Mr. COMER, Mr. 
M
CHENRY, Ms. DELACRUZ, Mrs. LESKO, Mr. JOHNSONof South Da-
kota, Mr. E
STES, Mr. YAKYM, Mr. CARL, Mr. GROTHMAN, Mr. VAN 
O
RDEN, Mr. ROUZER, Mr. MEUSER, Mr. KELLYof Mississippi, Mr. 
E
ZELL, Mr. CALVERT, Mr. SIMPSON, Mr. MCCAUL, and Mr. JOHNSON 
of Louisiana 
S
EPTEMBER1, 2023 
Reported from the Committee on Energy and Commerce; committed to the 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 1435 RH
Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered 
to be printed 
A BILL 
To amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination 
of the sale of internal combustion engines. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 1435 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Preserving Choice in 4
Vehicle Purchases Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. STATE STANDARDS. 6
(a) A
MENDMENTS.—Section 209(b) of the Clean Air 7
Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)) is amended— 8
(1) in paragraph (1)— 9
(A) in subparagraph (B), by striking the 10
‘‘or’’ at the end; 11
(B) in subparagraph (C), by striking 12
‘‘part.’’ and inserting ‘‘part, or’’; and 13
(C) by adding at the end the following: 14
‘‘(D) such State standards directly or indirectly 15
limit the sale or use of new motor vehicles with in-16
ternal combustion engines, as such term is defined 17
in section 63.9375 of title 40, Code of Federal Reg-18
ulations, as in effect January 1, 2023.’’; and 19
(2) by adding at the end the following: 20
‘‘(4) The Administrator may not determine that any 21
State standards amended after the date of enactment of 22
this paragraph are within the scope of a waiver granted 23
under paragraph (1) before the date of enactment of this 24
paragraph.’’. 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 1435 RH
(b) EFFECT ONCERTAINEXISTINGWAIVERS.—The 1
Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency 2
shall revoke a waiver granted under section 209(b) of the 3
Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)) during the period that 4
begins on January 1, 2022, and ends on the date of enact-5
ment of this Act if the Administrator finds that such waiv-6
er does not comply with subparagraph (D) of section 7
209(b)(1) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7543(b)(1)), 8
as added by this Act. 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. 
133 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
1
ST
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 1435 
[Report No. 118–169] 
A BILL 
To amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimi-
nation of the sale of internal combustion engines. 
S
EPTEMBER
1, 2023 
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the 
State of the Union and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:25 Sep 02, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H1435.RH H1435
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB