I 118THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. R. 1760 To extend the admission to Guam or the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands for certain nonimmigrant H–2B workers. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES MARCH23, 2023 Mr. M OYLANintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com- mittee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdic- tion of the committee concerned A BILL To extend the admission to Guam or the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands for certain non- immigrant H–2B workers. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF ADMISSION TO GUAM OR THE 3 COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MAR-4 IANA ISLANDS FOR CERTAIN NONIMMIGRANT 5 H–2B WORKERS. 6 Section 6(b)(1)(B) of the Joint Resolution entitled 7 ‘‘A Joint Resolution to approve the ‘Covenant to Establish 8 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:54 Apr 06, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1760.IH H1760 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 •HR 1760 IH a Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands in Po-1 litical Union with the United States of America’, and for 2 other purposes’’, approved March 24, 1976 (48 U.S.C. 11 3 1806(b)(1)(B)), is amended, in the matter preceding 4 clause (i), by striking ‘‘December 31, 2024’’ and inserting 5 ‘‘December 31, 2029’’. 6 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:54 Apr 06, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1760.IH H1760 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS