Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2531 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/14/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2531 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2016 
to extend the authority relating to cooperation between the United States 
and Israel on anti-tunnel defense capabilities. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL6, 2023 
Mr. S
CHNEIDER(for himself, Ms. MANNING, Mr. LAMBORN, and Mr. 
P
FLUGER) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign 
Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in 
each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdic-
tion of the committee concerned 
A BILL 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 
Year 2016 to extend the authority relating to cooperation 
between the United States and Israel on anti-tunnel de-
fense capabilities. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘United States-Israel 4
Anti-Tunnel Cooperation Extension Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:50 Apr 14, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2531.IH H2531
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 2531 IH
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF UNITED STATES-ISRAEL ANTI-TUN-1
NEL COOPERATION. 2
Section 1279(f) of the National Defense Authoriza-3
tion Act for Fiscal Year 2016 (22 U.S.C. 8606 note) is 4
amended by striking ‘‘December 31, 2024’’ and inserting 5
‘‘December 31, 2026’’. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:50 Apr 14, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2531.IH H2531
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB