Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3195 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 3195 
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits 
in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans 
of Operations, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY10, 2023 
Mr. S
TAUBER(for himself, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. GOSAR, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. 
G
IMENEZ, Mr. NEWHOUSE, Mrs. BOEBERT, Mr. LAWLER, Mrs. LESKO, 
Mr. E
MMER, Mr. DUARTE, Ms. HAGEMAN, and Mrs. FISCHBACH) intro-
duced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural 
Resources 
A BILL 
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral 
leases and permits in the Superior National Forest, to 
ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and 
for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Superior National For-4
est Restoration Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:04 May 20, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3195.IH H3195
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 3195 IH
SEC. 2. SUPERIOR NATIONAL FOREST SYSTEM LANDS IN 1
MINNESOTA. 2
(a) R
ESCISSION.—The order entitled ‘‘Public Land 3
Order No. 7917 for Withdrawal of Federal Lands; Cook, 4
Lake, and Saint Louis Counties, MN’’, issued by the Bu-5
reau of Land Management and dated January 31, 2023, 6
is hereby rescinded. 7
(b) T
IMELYREVIEW.—The Secretary shall complete 8
all necessary environmental and regulatory review, includ-9
ing processes subject to the National Environmental Pol-10
icy Act of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4321 et seq.), for all Mine 11
Plans of Operations within the Superior National Forest 12
lands in the State of Minnesota— 13
(1) with respect to such Mine Plans of Oper-14
ations submitted before the date of the enactment of 15
this section, not later than 18 months after the date 16
of enactment of this section; and 17
(2) with respect to a Mine Plan of Operations 18
submitted or resubmitted in the 7 year period begin-19
ning on the date of the enactment of this section, 20
not later than 18 months after the date on which 21
such Mine Plan of Operations is submitted or resub-22
mitted. 23
(c) R
EISSUANCE OFMINERALLEASES.— 24
(1) I
N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall issue 25
each mineral lease, preference right lease, and 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:04 May 20, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H3195.IH H3195
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 3195 IH
prospecting permit canceled by the Secretary relat-1
ing to lands within Superior National Forest during 2
the period beginning on January 31, 2021 and end-3
ing on the date of the enactment of this section on 4
the same terms as were in effect on the date of such 5
cancellations. 6
(2) J
UDICIAL REVIEW.—A lease or permit 7
issued under paragraph (1) is not subject to judicial 8
review. 9
(d) S
ECRETARYDEFINED.—For the purposes of this 10
section, the term ‘‘Secretary’’ means— 11
(1) the Secretary of the Interior; or 12
(2) when used with respect to any unit of the 13
National Forest System, the Secretary of Agri-14
culture. 15
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:04 May 20, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H3195.IH H3195
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS