Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3195 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/10/2024

                    IB 
Union Calendar No. 308 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 3195 
[Report No. 118–377] 
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral leases and permits 
in the Superior National Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine Plans 
of Operations, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY10, 2023 
Mr. S
TAUBER(for himself, Mr. CRENSHAW, Mr. GOSAR, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. 
G
IMENEZ, Mr. NEWHOUSE, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. LAWLER, Mrs. LESKO, 
Mr. E
MMER, Mr. DUARTE, Ms. HAGEMAN, and Mrs. FISCHBACH) intro-
duced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural 
Resources 
F
EBRUARY9, 2024 
Additional sponsor: Mr. F
INSTAD 
F
EBRUARY9, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole 
House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on May 10, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 3195 RH
A BILL 
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate mineral 
leases and permits in the Superior National Forest, to 
ensure timely review of Mine Plans of Operations, and 
for other purposes. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 3195 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Superior National For-4
est Restoration Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. SUPERIOR NATIONAL FOREST SYSTEM LANDS IN 6
MINNESOTA. 7
(a) R
ESCISSION.—The order entitled ‘‘Public Land 8
Order No. 7917 for Withdrawal of Federal Lands; Cook, 9
Lake, and Saint Louis Counties, MN’’, issued by the Bu-10
reau of Land Management and dated January 31, 2023, 11
is hereby rescinded. 12
(b) T
IMELYREVIEW.—The Secretary shall complete all 13
necessary environmental and regulatory review, including 14
processes subject to the National Environmental Policy Act 15
of 1969 (42 U.S.C. 4321 et seq.), for all Mine Plans of Oper-16
ations within the Superior National Forest lands in the 17
State of Minnesota— 18
(1) with respect to such Mine Plans of Oper-19
ations submitted before the date of the enactment of 20
this section, not later than 18 months after the date 21
of enactment of this section; and 22
(2) with respect to a Mine Plan of Operations 23
submitted or resubmitted in the 7 year period begin-24
ning on the date of the enactment of this section, not 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 
•HR 3195 RH
later than 18 months after the date on which such 1
Mine Plan of Operations is submitted or resubmitted. 2
(c) R
EISSUANCE OFMINERALLEASES.— 3
(1) I
N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall issue each 4
mineral lease, preference right lease, and prospecting 5
permit canceled by the Secretary relating to lands 6
within Superior National Forest during the period 7
beginning on January 31, 2021, and ending on the 8
date of the enactment of this section on the same 9
terms as were in effect on the date of such cancella-10
tions. 11
(2) J
UDICIAL REVIEW.—A lease or permit issued 12
under paragraph (1) is not subject to judicial review. 13
(d) S
ECRETARYDEFINED.—For the purposes of this 14
section, the term ‘‘Secretary’’ means— 15
(1) the Secretary of the Interior; or 16
(2) when used with respect to any unit of the 17
National Forest System, the Secretary of Agriculture. 18
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. 
308 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 3195 
[Report No. 118–377] 
A BILL 
To rescind Public Land Order 7917, to reinstate 
mineral leases and permits in the Superior Na-
tional Forest, to ensure timely review of Mine 
Plans of Operations, and for other purposes. 
F
EBRUARY
9, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com-
mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, 
and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:23 Feb 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H3195.RH H3195
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS