Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB336 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/25/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 336 
To immediately resume construction of the border wall system along the 
international border between the United States and Mexico to secure 
the border, enforce the rule of law, and expend appropriated funds 
as mandated by Congress, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY12, 2023 
Mr. H
IGGINSof Louisiana (for himself, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. GRAVESof 
Louisiana, Mr. R
ESCHENTHALER, Mr. FLEISCHMANN, Mr. GOSAR, Mr. 
P
OSEY, Mr. BALDERSON, Mrs. MILLERof Illinois, Mr. SMITHof New 
Jersey, Mr. C
LYDE, Mr. FRY, Mr. CARL, Mr. HUIZENGA, Mr. CARTER 
of Georgia, Mr. S
ESSIONS, Mr. GAETZ, Mr. JOHNSONof Ohio, Mrs. 
H
ARSHBARGER, Mr. BABIN, Mr. BOST, Mr. LATTA, Mr. GROTHMAN, Mr. 
H
UNT, Mr. LOUDERMILK, Mr. ZINKE, Mr. GUEST, Mr. ROY, Mr. BISHOP 
of North Carolina, Mrs. B
OEBERT, Mr. RUTHERFORD, Mr. MOOLENAAR, 
Mr. O
BERNOLTE, and Mr. JACKSONof Texas) introduced the following 
bill; which was referred to the Committee on Homeland Security 
A BILL 
To immediately resume construction of the border wall sys-
tem along the international border between the United 
States and Mexico to secure the border, enforce the 
rule of law, and expend appropriated funds as mandated 
by Congress, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 336 IH
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Finish the Wall Act’’. 2
SEC. 2. BORDER WALL SYSTEM CONSTRUCTION. 3
(a)(1) I
MMEDIATELYRESUMEBORDERWALLSYS-4
TEMCONSTRUCTION.—Not later than 24 hours after the 5
date of the enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Home-6
land Security shall resume all activities related to the con-7
struction of the border barrier system (also known as, and 8
referred to in this Act as, the ‘‘border wall system’’) along 9
the international border between the United States and 10
Mexico that were underway or being planned for prior to 11
January 20, 2021. 12
(2) N
OCANCELLATIONS.—The Secretary of Home-13
land Security may not cancel any contract for activities 14
related to border wall system construction referred to in 15
paragraph (1) that was entered into on or before January 16
20, 2021. 17
(3) U
SE OFFUNDS.—The Secretary of Homeland 18
Security shall expend all funds appropriated or explicitly 19
obligated for border wall system construction referred to 20
in paragraph (1) that were appropriated or obligated, as 21
the case may be, beginning on October 1, 2016, to carry 22
out this Act. 23
(4) I
MPLEMENTATION PLAN FORBORDERWALL 24
S
YSTEM.—Not later than 30 days after the date of the 25
enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 336 IH
shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees 1
an implementation plan to complete, by not later than 2
September 30, 2026, border wall system construction re-3
ferred to in paragraph (1) and funded in accordance with 4
paragraph (3). 5
(b) P
LANTOCOMPLETETACTICALINFRASTRUC-6
TURE ANDTECHNOLOGYELEMENTS OFBORDERWALL 7
S
YSTEM.—Not later than 90 days after the date of the 8
enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security 9
shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees 10
an implementation plan, including quarterly benchmarks 11
and cost estimates, for satisfying all requirements of bor-12
der wall system construction referred to in subsection 13
(a)(1), including tactical infrastructure, technology, and 14
other elements as identified by the Department of Home-15
land Security prior to January 20, 2021, through the ex-16
penditure of funds appropriated or explicitly obligated, as 17
the case may be, for use beginning on October 1, 2016, 18
as well as any future funds appropriated by Congress. 19
(c) U
PHOLDNEGOTIATEDAGREEMENTS.—The Sec-20
retary of Homeland Security shall ensure that all agree-21
ments executed in writing between the Department of 22
Homeland Security and private citizens, State, local, and 23
Tribal governments, and other stakeholders are honored 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 
•HR 336 IH
by the Department relating to current and future border 1
wall system construction as required by such agreements. 2
SEC. 3. DNA COLLECTION CONSISTENT WITH FEDERAL 3
LAW. 4
Not later than 14 days after the date of the enact-5
ment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security shall 6
ensure and certify to the Committee on Homeland Secu-7
rity of the House of Representatives and the Committee 8
on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs of the 9
Senate that U.S. Customs and Border Protection is fully 10
compliant with the DNA Fingerprint Act of 2005 at all 11
border facilities that process adults, including as part of 12
a family unit, in the custody of U.S. Customs and Border 13
Protection at the border. 14
SEC. 4. DEFINITIONS. 15
In this Act: 16
(1) A
PPROPRIATE CONGRESSIONAL COMMIT -17
TEES.—The term ‘‘appropriate congressional com-18
mittees’’ means the Committee on Homeland Secu-19
rity and the Committee on Appropriations of the 20
House of Representatives and the Committee on 21
Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs and 22
the Committee on Appropriations of the Senate. 23
(2) T
ACTICAL INFRASTRUCTURE .—The term 24
‘‘tactical infrastructure’’ includes boat ramps, access 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5 
•HR 336 IH
gates, checkpoints, lighting, and roads associated 1
with a border wall system. 2
(3) T
ECHNOLOGY.—The term ‘‘technology’’ in-3
cludes border surveillance and detection technology, 4
including linear ground detection systems, associated 5
with a border wall system. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:50 Jan 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H336.IH H336
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS