Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB4850 Introduced / Bill

Filed 08/14/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 4850 
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a retroactive effective 
date of law regarding charge to entitlement to Department of Veterans 
Affairs educational assistance for individuals who do not transfer credits 
from certain closed or disapproved programs of education. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JULY25, 2023 
Mr. B
UCHANANintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Veterans’ Affairs 
A BILL 
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a 
retroactive effective date of law regarding charge to enti-
tlement to Department of Veterans Affairs educational 
assistance for individuals who do not transfer credits 
from certain closed or disapproved programs of edu-
cation. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:37 Aug 10, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H4850.IH H4850
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 4850 IH
SECTION 1. RETROACTIVE EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW RE-1
GARDING CHARGE TO ENTITLEMENT TO DE-2
PARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS EDU-3
CATIONAL ASSISTANCE FOR INDIVIDUALS 4
WHO DO NOT TRANSFER CREDITS FROM CER-5
TAIN CLOSED OR DISAPPROVED PROGRAMS 6
OF EDUCATION. 7
Section 3699(c)(2) of title 38, United States Code, 8
is amended by striking subparagraph (C) and inserting 9
the following new subparagraph (C): 10
‘‘(C) This paragraph, including clauses (ii) and (iii) 11
of subparagraph (A), shall apply with respect to the clo-12
sure or discontinuation of a course or program of edu-13
cation, as described in subsection (b)(1), that occurs dur-14
ing the period beginning on August 1, 2021, and ending 15
on September 30, 2023.’’. 16
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:37 Aug 10, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H4850.IH H4850
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS