Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB524 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2024

                    IB 
Union Calendar No. 347 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 524 
[Report No. 118–421] 
To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to create an exemption for 
certain shoreline borrow sites. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY25, 2023 
Mr. R
OUZERintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Natural Resources 
M
ARCH12, 2024 
Additional sponsors: Ms. M
ACE, Mr. FLEISCHMANN, and Mr. VANDREW 
M
ARCH12, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole 
House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 25, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 524 RH
A BILL 
To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to create an 
exemption for certain shoreline borrow sites. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 524 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. FEDERAL COASTAL STORM RISK MANAGEMENT 3
PROJECTS. 4
Section 6(a) of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 5
U.S.C. 3505(a)) is amended by adding at the end the fol-6
lowing: 7
‘‘(7) Use of a sand source within a System unit 8
by Federal coastal storm risk management projects or 9
their predecessor projects that have used a system unit 10
for sand to nourish adjacent beaches outside the Sys-11
tem pursuant to section 5 of the Act of August 18, 12
1941 (commonly known as the ‘Flood Control Act of 13
1941’) (55 Stat. 650, chapter 377; 33 U.S.C. 701n) at 14
least once between December 31, 2008 and December 15
31, 2023 in response to an emergency situation prior 16
to December 31, 2023.’’. 17
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. 
347 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 524 
[Report No. 118–421] 
A BILL 
To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to 
create an exemption for certain shoreline borrow 
sites. 
M
ARCH
12, 2024 
Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com-
mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, 
and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS