Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB5283 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/18/2023

                    IB 
Union Calendar No. 220 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 5283 
[Report No. 118–275, Part I] 
To prohibit the use of Federal funds to provide housing to specified aliens 
on any land under the administrative jurisdiction of the Federal land 
management agencies. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
AUGUST25, 2023 
Ms. M
ALLIOTAKIS(for herself, Mr. NEWHOUSE, Ms. STEFANIK, Mr. 
D
ONALDS, Mr. D’ESPOSITO, Mr. WEBERof Texas, Mr. STAUBER, and 
Mr. K
ELLYof Pennsylvania) introduced the following bill; which was re-
ferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the 
Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by 
the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall with-
in the jurisdiction of the committee concerned 
N
OVEMBER17, 2023 
Additional sponsors: Mr. T
ONYGONZALESof Texas, Mr. SMITHof New Jer-
sey, Mr. W
ILLIAMSof New York, Ms. HAGEMAN, Mr. MILLS, Ms. 
B
OEBERT, Mr. SCOTTFRANKLINof Florida, Mr. RESCHENTHALER, and 
Mr. M
CCAUL 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 5283 RH
NOVEMBER17, 2023 
Reported from the Committee on Natural Resources with an amendment 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
NOVEMBER17, 2023 
Committee on Agriculture discharged; committed to the Committee of the 
Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on August 25, 2023] 
A BILL 
To prohibit the use of Federal funds to provide housing 
to specified aliens on any land under the administrative 
jurisdiction of the Federal land management agencies. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 5283 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SEC. 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Protecting our Commu-4
nities from Failure to Secure the Border Act of 2023’’. 5
SEC. 2. PROHIBITION ON PROVIDING HOUSING TO SPECI-6
FIED ALIENS. 7
(a) I
NGENERAL.—No Federal funds may be used to 8
provide housing to specified aliens on any land under the 9
administrative jurisdiction of the Federal land manage-10
ment agencies, including through leases, contracts, or agree-11
ments. 12
(b) R
EVOCATION OFLEASE.—The lease between the 13
United States of America/United States Department of the 14
Interior/National Park Service and the City of New York 15
for the Premises known as Portions of Floyd Bennett Field, 16
in the Jamaica Bay Unit of Gateway National Recreation 17
Area (NPS Lease# L–GATE912–2023, Commencement 18
Date - September 15, 2023) is hereby revoked. 19
(c) D
EFINITIONS.—In this section: 20
(1) F
EDERAL LAND MANAGEMENT AGENCIES .— 21
The term ‘‘Federal land management agencies’’ means 22
the National Park Service, the Bureau of Land Man-23
agement, the United States Fish and Wildlife Service, 24
and the Forest Service. 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 5283 RH
(2) HOUSING.—The term ‘‘housing’’ means a 1
temporary or permanent encampment used for the 2
primary purpose of sheltering specified aliens. 3
(3) S
PECIFIED ALIEN.—The term ‘‘specified 4
alien’’ means an alien who has not been admitted, as 5
such terms are defined in section 101(a) of the Immi-6
gration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1101(a)). 7
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB Union Calendar No. 
220 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
1
ST
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 5283 
[Report No. 118–275, Part I] 
A BILL 
To prohibit the use of Federal funds to provide 
housing to specified aliens on any land under the 
administrative jurisdiction of the Federal land 
management agencies. 
N
OVEMBER
17, 2023 
Reported from the Committee on Natural Resources with 
an amendment 
N
OVEMBER
17, 2023 
Committee on Agriculture discharged; committed to the 
Committee of the Whole House on the State of the 
Union and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:56 Nov 17, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H5283.RH H5283
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB