Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB5692 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/05/2023

                    II 
Calendar No. 216 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 5692 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
SEPTEMBER30 (legislative day, SEPTEMBER22), 2023 
Received; read the first time 
O
CTOBER3, 2023 
Read the second time and placed on the calendar 
AN ACT 
Making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year 
ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
That the following sums are appropriated, out of any 3
money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, for the 4
fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other pur-5
poses, namely: 6
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS 2 
HR 5692 PCS
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE 1
OPERATIONS AND MAINTENANCE 2
O
PERATIONS ANDMAINTENANCE, DEFENSE-WIDE 3
(INCLUDING TRANSFER OF FUNDS) 4
For an additional amount for ‘‘Operations and Main-5
tenance, Defense-Wide’’, for the Defense Security Co-6
operation Agency, $300,000,000, to remain available until 7
September 30, 2025, which shall be for the Ukraine Secu-8
rity Assistance Initiative: Provided, That such funds shall 9
be available to the Secretary of Defense, with the concur-10
rence of the Secretary of State, to provide assistance, in-11
cluding training; equipment; lethal assistance; logistics 12
support, supplies and services; salaries and stipends; 13
sustainment; and intelligence support to the military and 14
national security forces of Ukraine, and to other forces 15
or groups recognized by and under the authority of the 16
Government of Ukraine, including governmental entities 17
within Ukraine, engaged in resisting Russian aggression 18
against Ukraine, for replacement of any weapons or arti-19
cles provided to the Government of Ukraine from the in-20
ventory of the United States, and to recover or dispose 21
of equipment procured using funds made available in this 22
section in this or prior Acts: Provided further, That the 23
Secretary of Defense shall, not less than 15 days prior 24
to obligating funds made available in this section, notify 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS 3 
HR 5692 PCS
the congressional defense committees in writing of the de-1
tails of any such obligation: Provided further, That the 2
Secretary of Defense shall, not more than 60 days after 3
such notification is made, inform such committees if such 4
funds have not been obligated and the reasons therefor: 5
Provided further, That the Secretary of Defense shall con-6
sult with such committees in advance of the provision of 7
support provided to other forces or groups recognized by 8
and under the authority of the Government of Ukraine: 9
Provided further, That the United States may accept 10
equipment procured using funds made available in this 11
section in this or prior Acts transferred to the security 12
forces of Ukraine and returned by such forces to the 13
United States: Provided further, That equipment procured 14
using funds made available in this section in this or prior 15
Acts, and not yet transferred to the military or national 16
security forces of Ukraine or to other assisted entities, or 17
returned by such forces or other assisted entities to the 18
United States, may be treated as stocks of the Depart-19
ment of Defense upon written notification to the congres-20
sional defense committees: Provided further, That any no-21
tification of funds made available in this section in this 22
or prior Acts shall specify whether such funds support on-23
going or new programs, the duration and expected cost 24
over the life of each program, a timeline for the delivery 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS 4 
HR 5692 PCS
of defense articles and defense services, and any equip-1
ment that requires enhanced end-use monitoring: Provided 2
further, That the Secretary of Defense shall provide quar-3
terly reports to the congressional defense committees on 4
the use and status of funds made available in this section: 5
Provided further, That of the amounts provided under this 6
heading, $20,000,000 shall be transferred to the Office 7
of Special Inspector General for Ukraine Assistance, as 8
established in section 103 of this Act. 9
GENERAL PROVISIONS—THIS ACT 10
S
EC. 101. Each amount appropriated or made avail-11
able by this Act is in addition to amounts otherwise appro-12
priated for the fiscal year involved. 13
S
EC. 102. Unless otherwise provided for by this Act, 14
the additional amounts appropriated by this Act to appro-15
priations accounts shall be available under the authorities 16
and conditions applicable to such appropriations accounts 17
for fiscal year 2024. 18
S
EC. 103. There is established the Office of the Spe-19
cial Inspector General for Ukraine Assistance for the fol-20
lowing: 21
(1) To provide for the independent and objective con-22
duct and supervision of audits and investigations, includ-23
ing within the territory of Ukraine, relating to the pro-24
grams and operations funded with amounts appropriated 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS 5 
HR 5692 PCS
or otherwise made available for the military and non-1
military support of Ukraine. 2
(2) To provide for the independent and objective lead-3
ership and coordination of, and recommendations on, poli-4
cies designed to prevent and detect waste, fraud, and 5
abuse in such programs and operations described in para-6
graph (1). 7
(3) To provide for an independent and objective 8
means of keeping the Secretary of State, the Secretary 9
of Defense, and Congress fully and currently informed 10
about problems and deficiencies relating to the adminis-11
tration of such programs and operations and the necessity 12
for and progress on corrective action. 13
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Ukraine Security As-14
sistance and Oversight Supplemental Appropriations Act, 15
2024’’. 16
Passed the House of Representatives September 28, 
2023. 
Attest: KEVIN F. MCCUMBER, 
Clerk. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS Calendar No. 
216 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
1
ST
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 5692 
AN ACT 
Making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal 
year ending September 30, 2024, and for other 
purposes. 
O
CTOBER
3, 2023 
Read the second time and placed on the calendar 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:18 Oct 04, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H5692.PCS H5692
rfrederick on DSKB3L4F33PROD with BILLS