Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB7098 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2024

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 7098 
To direct the Secretary of Defense to conduct a study to identify the private 
entities participating in Skillbridge that offer positions in registered 
apprenticeship programs to members of the Armed Forces. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY25, 2024 
Ms. S
HERRILL(for herself, Mrs. KIGGANSof Virginia, Mr. ALLRED, Mr. 
C
ROW, Mr. DAVISof North Carolina, Mr. GOTTHEIMER, Mr. KIMof New 
Jersey, Ms. N
ORTON, Ms. TITUS, and Ms. TOKUDA) introduced the fol-
lowing bill; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services 
A BILL 
To direct the Secretary of Defense to conduct a study to 
identify the private entities participating in Skillbridge 
that offer positions in registered apprenticeship programs 
to members of the Armed Forces. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Servicemember Ap-4
prenticeship Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:52 Jan 31, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H7098.IH H7098
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 7098 IH
SEC. 2. SKILLBRIDGE: STUDY ON APPRENTICESHIP PRO-1
GRAMS. 2
(a) S
TUDY.—Not later than September 30, 2024, the 3
Secretary of Defense, in consultation with the Secretary 4
of the Department in which the Coast Guard is operating, 5
shall conduct a study to identify the private entities par-6
ticipating in Skillbridge that offer positions in registered 7
apprenticeship programs to covered members. 8
(b) R
ECRUITMENT.—The Secretary shall consult with 9
officials and employees of the Department of Labor who 10
have experience with registered apprenticeship programs 11
to facilitate the Secretary entering into agreements with 12
entities that offer positions described in subsection (a) in 13
areas where the Secretary determines few such positions 14
are available to covered members. 15
(c) D
EFINITIONS.—In this section: 16
(1) The term ‘‘covered member’’ means a mem-17
ber of the Armed Forces eligible for Skillbridge. 18
(2) The term ‘‘registered apprenticeship pro-19
gram’’ means an apprenticeship program registered 20
under the Act of August 16, 1937 (commonly known 21
as the ‘‘National Apprenticeship Act’’; 50 Stat. 664, 22
chapter 663; 29 U.S.C. 50 et seq.). 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:52 Jan 31, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H7098.IH H7098
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 7098 IH
(3) The term ‘‘Skillbridge’’ means an employ-1
ment skills training program under section 1143(e) 2
of title 10, United States Code. 3
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:52 Jan 31, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H7098.IH H7098
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB