I 118THCONGRESS 2 DSESSION H. R. 8344 To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Congress a report on available assistance to agricultural producers in the State of Texas that have suffered economic losses due to the failure of Mexico to deliver water. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES MAY10, 2024 Ms. D ELACRUZ(for herself, Ms. CROCKETT, and Mr. TONYGONZALESof Texas) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Agriculture A BILL To require the Secretary of Agriculture to submit to Con- gress a report on available assistance to agricultural producers in the State of Texas that have suffered eco- nomic losses due to the failure of Mexico to deliver water. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Texas Agricultural 4 Producers Assistance Act’’. 5 VerDate Sep 11 2014 16:04 Jun 08, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •HR 8344 IH SEC. 2. REPORT ON AVAILABLE ASSISTANCE TO AGRICUL-1 TURAL PRODUCERS IN THE STATE OF TEXAS 2 THAT HAVE SUFFERED ECONOMIC LOSSES 3 DUE TO THE FAILURE OF MEXICO TO DE-4 LIVER WATER. 5 Not later than 180 days after the date of the enact-6 ment of this Act, the Secretary of Agriculture shall submit 7 to the Committee on Agriculture of the House of Rep-8 resentatives and the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, 9 and Forestry of the Senate a report that lists all existing 10 authorities of the Secretary and programs within the De-11 partment of Agriculture that are or could be made avail-12 able to provide assistance to agricultural producers in the 13 State of Texas that have suffered economic losses due to 14 the failure of Mexico to deliver water to the United States 15 in accordance with the Treaty Relating to the Utilization 16 of Waters of the Colorado and Tijuana Rivers and of the 17 Rio Grande signed at Washington on February 3, 1944, 18 and the Supplementary Protocol signed at Washington on 19 November 14, 1944. 20 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:19 Jun 14, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H8344.IH H8344 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS