Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB8564 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/17/2024

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 8564 
To require certain elements of the intelligence community to submit to the 
congressional intelligence committees a report with respect to bio-
technology threats, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY23, 2024 
Mr. W
ENSTRUP(for himself and Mr. KRISHNAMOORTHI) introduced the fol-
lowing bill; which was referred to the Permanent Select Committee on In-
telligence 
A BILL 
To require certain elements of the intelligence community 
to submit to the congressional intelligence committees 
a report with respect to biotechnology threats, and for 
other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Elevating Bio-4
technology Threats Reporting Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 20:24 Jul 10, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8564.IH H8564
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 8564 IH
SEC. 2. REPORTING REQUIREMENT ON BIOTECHNOLOGY 1
THREATS WITH RESPECT TO CERTAIN ELE-2
MENTS OF THE INTELLIGENCE COMMUNITY. 3
(a) R
EPORTINGREQUIREMENT.—Not later than 4
June 30, 2025, the head of each covered element of the 5
intelligence community shall submit a separate report to 6
the congressional intelligence committees with respect to 7
biotechnology threats and intelligence activities related to 8
biotechnology threats. 9
(b) M
ATTERSINCLUDED.—Each report under sub-10
section (a) shall include, with respect to each covered ele-11
ment of the intelligence community, the following: 12
(1) A description of any gaps that exist with re-13
spect to intelligence activities that impede such ele-14
ment from fully targeting, collecting, and analyzing 15
intelligence related to biotechnology threats. 16
(2) A description of any existing formal mecha-17
nisms by which the intelligence community provides 18
intelligence and support with respect to bio-19
technology threats to— 20
(A) departments and agencies of the Fed-21
eral Government outside the intelligence com-22
munity; 23
(B) the governments of foreign countries; 24
and 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:58 Jul 16, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H8564.IH H8564
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 8564 IH
(C) private industry and academic institu-1
tions. 2
(3) An assessment of any existing mechanisms 3
and manners by which the intelligence community 4
consults with biotechnology experts and other out-5
side experts with related expertise. 6
(c) C
OVEREDELEMENTS OF THE INTELLIGENCE 7
C
OMMUNITY.—For purposes of this section, the covered 8
elements of the intelligence community are as follows: 9
(1) The Central Intelligence Agency. 10
(2) The Defense Intelligence Agency. 11
(3) The Federal Bureau of Investigation. 12
(4) The National Security Agency. 13
(5) The Office of the Director of National Intel-14
ligence. 15
(d) D
EFINITIONS.—In this section, the terms ‘‘con-16
gressional intelligence committees’’, ‘‘intelligence commu-17
nity’’, and ‘‘intelligence’’ each have the meaning given 18
such terms in section 3 of the National Security Act of 19
1947 (50 U.S.C. 3003). 20
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 20:24 Jul 10, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H8564.IH H8564
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS