Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB979 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2023

                    I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 979 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018 
and the John S. McCain National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 
Year 2019 to extend certain expiring provisions of law relating to the 
detention of individuals at United States Naval Station Guantanamo 
Bay, Cuba. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY10, 2023 
Mr. F
ALLON(for himself, Mr. MOYLAN, Mr. DESJARLAIS, Mr. GIMENEZ, and 
Mr. M
ILLS) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on Armed Services 
A BILL 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 
Year 2018 and the John S. McCain National Defense 
Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019 to extend certain 
expiring provisions of law relating to the detention of 
individuals at United States Naval Station Guantanamo 
Bay, Cuba. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘No Terrorists on U.S. 4
Soil Act of 2023’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:51 Mar 07, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H979.IH H979
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 979 IH
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF PROHIBITION ON USE OF FUNDS 1
FOR TRANSFER OF INDIVIDUALS DETAINED 2
AT UNITED STATES NAVAL STATION GUANTA-3
NAMO BAY, CUBA. 4
Section 1033 of the John S. McCain National De-5
fense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019 (Public Law 6
115–232; 132 Stat. 1954), as most recently amended by 7
section 1031 of the James M. Inhofe National Defense 8
Authorization for Fiscal Year 2023 (Public Law 117–263) 9
is further amended by striking ‘‘December 31, 2023’’ and 10
inserting ‘‘December 31, 2024’’. 11
SEC. 3. EXTENSION OF PROHIBITION ON USE OF FUNDS TO 12
CONSTRUCT OR MODIFY FACILITIES IN THE 13
UNITED STATES TO HOUSE DETAINEES 14
TRANSFERRED FROM UNITED STATES NAVAL 15
STATION GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA. 16
Section 1034(a) of the John S. McCain National De-17
fense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019 (Public Law 18
115–232; 132 Stat. 1954), as most recently amended by 19
section 1032 of the James M. Inhofe National Defense 20
Authorization for Fiscal Year 2023 (Public Law 117–263) 21
is further amended by striking ‘‘December 31, 2023’’ and 22
inserting ‘‘December 31, 2024’’. 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:51 Mar 07, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H979.IH H979
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 979 IH
SEC. 4. EXTENSION OF PROHIBITION ON USE OF FUNDS TO 1
CLOSE OR RELINQUISH CONTROL OF UNITED 2
STATES NAVAL STATION GUANTANAMO BAY, 3
CUBA. 4
Section 1036 of the National Defense Authorization 5
Act for Fiscal Year 2018 (Public Law 115–91; 131 Stat. 6
1551), as most recently amended by section 1034 of the 7
James M. Inhofe National Defense Authorization Act for 8
Fiscal Year 2023 (Public Law 117–263) is further amend-9
ed by striking ‘‘2023’’ and inserting ‘‘2024’’. 10
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:51 Mar 07, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H979.IH H979
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS