Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR24 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2023

                    IA 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. J. RES. 24 
Disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving 
the Local Resident Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2022. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY31, 2023 
Mr. C
OMER(for himself, Ms. FOXX, Mr. CLOUD, Mr. CLYDE, Mr. GROTHMAN, 
Ms. M
ACE, Mr. DONALDS, Mr. PFLUGER, Ms. TENNEY, Mr. BIGGS, Mr. 
F
ALLON, Mr. HIGGINSof Louisiana, Mr. NORMAN, Mr. LATURNER, and 
Mr. S
ESSIONS) submitted the following joint resolution; which was re-
ferred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability 
JOINT RESOLUTION 
Disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council 
in approving the Local Resident Voting Rights Amend-
ment Act of 2022. 
Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives1
of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
That the Congress disapproves of the action of the District 3
of Columbia Council described as follows: The Local Resi-4
dent Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2022 (D.C. Act 5
24–640), enacted by the Council of the District of Colum-6
bia on November 21, 2022, and transmitted to Congress 7
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:59 Feb 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HJ24.IH HJ24
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HJ 24 IH 
pursuant to section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia 1
Home Rule Act on January 10, 2023. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:59 Feb 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HJ24.IH HJ24
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB