Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR1210 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/10/2024

                    IV 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. RES. 1210 
Condemning the Biden border crisis and the tremendous burdens law 
enforcement officers face as a result. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY8, 2024 
Mr. H
IGGINSof Louisiana (for himself, Ms. LETLOW, Mr. BRECHEEN, Mr. 
G
UEST, Mr. EZELL, and Mr. GREENof Tennessee) submitted the fol-
lowing resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, 
and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to 
be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consider-
ation of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee 
concerned 
RESOLUTION 
Condemning the Biden border crisis and the tremendous 
burdens law enforcement officers face as a result. 
Whereas the Biden administration brazenly eliminated effec-
tive and lawful Trump administration immigration en-
forcement policies, directly leading to the worst border 
crisis in the history of the Nation and affecting every 
State; 
Whereas the Biden administration’s failed border policies 
have resulted in an exponential rise in illegal alien en-
counters, totaling more than 9,300,000 in less than 4 
years; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 1210 IH 
Whereas over 1,800,000 known ‘‘gotaways’’ have crossed the 
border illegally and evaded apprehension, with the admin-
istration having no idea of their identity, whereabouts, or 
intent; 
Whereas at least 362 individuals on the terrorist watch list 
have been apprehended trying to illegally enter the coun-
try between ports of entry since fiscal year 2021; 
Whereas fentanyl and other synthetic opioids are pouring into 
the United States, forcing local police departments to 
issue naloxone, a lifesaving medication used to reverse 
opioid overdoses, to every officer; 
Whereas the suffering endured by the American people from 
the unprecedented rise in dangerous crime and historic 
levels of drug-related deaths is the direct result of an un-
secured border; 
Whereas elected Democrats from Colorado, Illinois, Massa-
chusetts, New York, Texas, and Washington, DC, have 
declared states of emergency as a result of the border cri-
sis; 
Whereas Democrat-led sanctuary cities have slashed city 
budgets, including funding for law enforcement; 
Whereas law enforcement officers in the United States have 
suffered through calls by politicians and activists to 
‘‘defund the police’’ and are now suffering from histori-
cally low levels of recruitment and morale as a result of 
these attacks to their profession; 
Whereas migrant gangs, such as the violent Venezuelan gang 
Tren de Aragua, actively recruit newly arrived illegal 
aliens into theft rings and criminal networks; 
Whereas New York City Police Department Commissioner 
Edward Caban has warned New Yorkers of a ‘‘wave of 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 1210 IH 
migrant crime’’, and Democrat Mayor Eric Adams has 
claimed the migrant crisis will ‘‘destroy New York City’’; 
Whereas, on February 23, 2024, Venezuelan national Jose 
Antonio Ibarra was arrested and charged with the mur-
der of 22-year-old student Laken Riley; 
Whereas Ibarra entered the country illegally in September 
2022 and was subsequently released by U.S. Customs 
and Border Protection into the interior; 
Whereas, on March 2, 2024, an illegal alien, who entered the 
United States as a ‘‘gotaway’’ at an unknown time and 
location, allegedly struck and killed Washington State 
Trooper Christopher Gadd; 
Whereas a Haitian national who entered the United States 
via the unlawful Cuban, Haitian, Nicaraguan, and Ven-
ezuelan parole program, was arrested on March 13, 
2024, for the sexual assault of a 15-year-old girl at an 
illegal alien shelter in Massachusetts; 
Whereas an illegal alien from Lebanon apprehended while il-
legally crossing the southwest border on March 9, 2024, 
admitted to being a Hezbollah terrorist and having inten-
tions to make a bomb; 
Whereas, on March 21, 2024, illegal aliens in El Paso rushed 
the border fence and Texas National Guard troops in an 
effort to breach the border into the United States; 
Whereas a previously deported illegal alien was charged on 
March 23, 2024, with murdering 25-year-old Michigan 
resident Ruby Garcia; 
Whereas, on March 27, 2024, an illegal alien from China ille-
gally breached a military base in California and refused 
to leave; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HRES 1210 IH 
Whereas, on January 27, 2024, 2 New York City Police De-
partment officers were assaulted by more than a dozen 
illegal alien suspects in Times Square, many of whom 
were set free without bail; and 
Whereas law enforcement officers are increasingly targeted 
and assaulted by illegal aliens while Democrat elected of-
ficials prioritize illegal alien criminals over citizens and 
legal residents of the United States: Now, therefore, be 
it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) acknowledges that United States law en-2
forcement officers are bravely facing dangers and 3
challenges every day that are exacerbated by the un-4
precedented crisis at the border, which affects the 5
entire country; 6
(2) condemns the open border crisis that Presi-7
dent Joe Biden, ‘‘Border Czar’’ Vice President 8
Kamala Harris, Secretary of the Department of 9
Homeland Security Alejandro Mayorkas, and other 10
Biden administration officials have willingly created 11
along the southwest border; 12
(3) urges the Biden administration, and State 13
and local elected officials, to encourage and support 14
dedicated law enforcement officers so those officers 15
can protect the homeland, their cities, counties, or 16
States, and restore law and order; and 17
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•HRES 1210 IH 
(4) recognizes and sympathizes with law en-1
forcement officers in the United States who have 2
suffered through the mental, physical, and psycho-3
logical stress associated with the lack of support, 4
trust, and respect they face in our country today. 5
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:26 May 09, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR1210.IH HR1210
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB