Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1260 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/27/2023

                    II 
Calendar No. 159 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 1260 
[Report No. 118–75] 
To release the reversionary interest of the United States in certain non- 
Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, and for other purposes. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
APRIL25, 2023 
Mr. L
EE(for himself and Mr. ROMNEY) introduced the following bill; which 
was read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural 
Resources 
J
ULY25, 2023 
Reported by Mr. M
ANCHIN, with an amendment and an amendment to the 
title 
[Omit the part struck through and insert the part printed in italic] 
A BILL 
To release the reversionary interest of the United States 
in certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, 
and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 1260 RS
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘University of Utah 2
Research Park Act’’. 3
SEC.2.RELEASE OFREVERSIONARY INTEREST OFTHE 4
UNITED STATESINNON-FEDERAL LANDIN 5
SALTLAKECITY,UTAH. 6
(a)RELEASE.—ThereisreleasedtotheUniversityof 7
Utah,withoutconsideration,thereversionaryinterestof 8
theUnitedStatesinthenon-Federallanddescribedin 9
subsection(b). 10
(b)DESCRIPTIONOFNON-FEDERALLAND.—The 11
non-Federallandreferredtoinsubsection(a)istheap-12
proximately593acresoflandoftheUniversityofUtah— 13
(1)identifiedinthepatent— 14
(A)numbered43–99–0012;and 15
(B)datedOctober18,1968;and 16
(2)moreparticularlydescribedastractsD(ex-17
cludingtheparcelsnumbered1,2,3,4,and5),G, 18
andJ,T.1S.,R.1E.,SaltLakeMeridian. 19
SEC. 2. CONFIRMATION OF USE OF CERTAIN NON-FEDERAL 20
LAND IN SALT LAKE CITY, UTAH, FOR VALID 21
PUBLIC PURPOSES. 22
(a) C
ONFIRMATION OFUSES.— 23
(1) I
N GENERAL.—The use by the University of 24
Utah of the land described in subsection (b) as a Uni-25
versity research park, as approved by the letter from 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•S 1260 RS
the Secretary of the Interior to the University of Utah 1
dated December 10, 1970, and any modifications of 2
the approved plan of development and management 3
approved by the Department of the Interior prior to 4
the date of enactment of this Act, is confirmed as a 5
valid public purpose consistent with the requirements 6
of the Act of June 14, 1926 (commonly known as the 7
‘‘Recreation and Public Purposes Act’’) (44 Stat. 741, 8
chapter 578; 43 U.S.C. 869 et seq.), subject to the 9
terms and conditions included in the letter and ap-10
provals. 11
(2) O
THER USES.—Any other uses of the land 12
described in subsection (b) by the University of Utah 13
that are consistent with use as a University research 14
park and related university purposes (including de-15
velopment of student housing and a transit hub) are 16
confirmed as valid public purposes consistent with the 17
requirements of the Act of June 14, 1926 (commonly 18
known as the ‘‘Recreation and Public Purposes Act’’) 19
(44 Stat. 741, chapter 578; 43 U.S.C. 869 et seq.), 20
subject to the terms and conditions referred to in 21
paragraph (1). 22
(b) D
ESCRIPTION OFNON-FEDERALLAND.—The land 23
referred to in subsection (a) is the approximately 593.54 24
acres of land conveyed to the University of Utah under the 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•S 1260 RS
Act of June 14, 1926 (commonly known as the ‘‘Recreation 1
and Public Purposes Act’’) (44 Stat. 741, chapter 578; 43 2
U.S.C. 869 et seq.), by patent numbered 43–99–0012 and 3
dated October 18, 1968, and more particularly described as 4
tracts D (excluding parcels numbered 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5), 5
G, and J, T. 1 S., R. 1 E., Salt Lake Meridian. 6
Amend the title so as to read: ‘‘A bill to confirm the 
use of certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, 
for public purposes, and for other purposes.’’. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB Calendar No. 
159 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
1
ST
S
ESSION
 
S. 1260 
[Report No. 118–75] 
A BILL 
To release the reversionary interest of the United 
States in certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake 
City, Utah, and for other purposes. 
J
ULY
25, 2023 
Reported with an amendment and an amendment to the 
title 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:17 Jul 26, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\S1260.RS S1260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB