Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1822 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/09/2023

                    II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 1822 
To require U.S. Customs and Border Protection to expand the use of non- 
intrusive inspection systems at land ports of entry. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
JUNE6, 2023 
Mr. P
ETERS(for himself and Mr. CORNYN) introduced the following bill; 
which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Secu-
rity and Governmental Affairs 
A BILL 
To require U.S. Customs and Border Protection to expand 
the use of non-intrusive inspection systems at land ports 
of entry. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Non-Intrusive Inspec-4
tion Expansion Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. USE OF NON-INTRUSIVE INSPECTION SYSTEMS AT 6
LAND PORTS OF ENTRY. 7
(a) F
ISCALYEAR2026.—Using non-intrusive inspec-8
tion systems acquired through previous appropriations 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:34 Jun 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1822.IS S1822
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•S 1822 IS
Acts, beginning not later than September 30, 2026, U.S. 1
Customs and Border Protection shall use non-intrusive in-2
spection systems at land ports of entry to scan not fewer 3
than— 4
(1) 40 percent, cumulatively, of passenger vehi-5
cles entering the United States through land ports 6
of entry; and 7
(2) 90 percent, cumulatively, of commercial ve-8
hicles entering the United States through land ports 9
of entry. 10
(b) S
UBSEQUENTFISCALYEARS.—Beginning in fis-11
cal year 2027, U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall 12
use non-intrusive inspection systems at land ports of entry 13
to reach the next projected benchmark for incremental 14
scanning of passenger and commercial vehicles entering 15
the United States at such ports of entry. 16
(c) B
RIEFING.—Not later than May 30, 2026, the 17
Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection 18
shall brief the Committee on Homeland Security and Gov-19
ernmental Affairs of the Senate and the Committee on 20
Homeland Security of the House of Representatives re-21
garding the progress made during the first half of fiscal 22
year 2026 in achieving the scanning benchmarks described 23
in subsection (a). 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:34 Jun 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1822.IS S1822
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•S 1822 IS
(d) REPORT.—If the scanning benchmarks described 1
in subsection (a) are not met by the end of fiscal year 2
2026, not later than 120 days after the end of that fiscal 3
year, the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Pro-4
tection shall submit a report to the Committee on Home-5
land Security and Governmental Affairs of the Senate and 6
the Committee on Homeland Security of the House of 7
Representatives that— 8
(1) analyzes the causes for not meeting such re-9
quirements; 10
(2) identifies any resource gaps and challenges; 11
and 12
(3) details the steps that will be taken to ensure 13
compliance with such requirements in the subse-14
quent fiscal year. 15
SEC. 3. NON-INTRUSIVE INSPECTION SYSTEMS FOR OUT-16
BOUND INSPECTIONS. 17
(a) F
EASIBILITYSTUDY.—Not later than 270 days 18
after the date of the enactment of this Act, the Commis-19
sioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall sub-20
mit a report to the Committee on Homeland Security and 21
Governmental Affairs of the Senate and the Committee 22
on Homeland Security of the House of Representatives 23
that analyzes the feasibility of using non-intrusive inspec-24
tion systems to scan 10 percent of all vehicles exiting the 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:34 Jun 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1822.IS S1822
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 
•S 1822 IS
United States through land ports of entry with equipment 1
available on the date of the enactment of this Act. 2
(b) I
MPLEMENTATION.—Beginning not later than 3
September 30, 2026, U.S. Customs and Border Protection 4
shall use non-intrusive inspection systems at land ports 5
of entry to scan not fewer than 10 percent of all vehicles 6
exiting the United States through land ports of entry. 7
SEC. 4. GAO REVIEW AND REPORT. 8
(a) R
EVIEW.— 9
(1) I
N GENERAL.—The Comptroller General of 10
the United States shall conduct a review of the use 11
by U.S. Customs and Border Protection of non-in-12
trusive inspection systems for border security. 13
(2) E
LEMENTS.—The review required under 14
paragraph (1) shall— 15
(A) identify— 16
(i) the number and types of non-intru-17
sive inspection systems deployed by U.S. 18
Customs and Border Protection; and 19
(ii) the locations to which such sys-20
tems have been deployed; and 21
(B) examine the manner in which U.S. 22
Customs and Border Protection— 23
(i) assesses the effectiveness of such 24
systems; and 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:34 Jun 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1822.IS S1822
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5 
•S 1822 IS
(ii) uses such systems in conjunction 1
with other border security resources and 2
assets, such as border barriers and tech-3
nology, to detect and interdict drug smug-4
gling and trafficking at the southwest bor-5
der of the United States. 6
(b) R
EPORT.—Not later than 2 years after the date 7
of the enactment of this Act, the Comptroller General shall 8
submit a report to the Committee on Homeland Security 9
and Governmental Affairs of the Senate and the Com-10
mittee on Homeland Security of the House of Representa-11
tives containing the findings of the review conducted pur-12
suant to subsection (a). 13
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:34 Jun 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1822.IS S1822
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS