Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB3136 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/30/2023

                    II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 3136 
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to extend the requirement 
for State Medicaid plans to provide coverage for medication-assisted 
treatment. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
OCTOBER26, 2023 
Ms. H
ASSAN(for herself and Mrs. BLACKBURN) introduced the following bill; 
which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance 
A BILL 
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to extend 
the requirement for State Medicaid plans to provide cov-
erage for medication-assisted treatment. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Extending Access to 4
Addiction Treatment Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 16:42 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3136.IS S3136 2 
•S 3136 IS
SEC. 2. EXTENDING REQUIREMENT FOR STATE MEDICAID 1
PLANS TO PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR MEDICA-2
TION-ASSISTED TREATMENT. 3
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Section 1905 of the Social Secu-4
rity Act (42 U.S.C. 1396d) is amended— 5
(1) in subsection (a)(29), by striking ‘‘for the 6
period beginning October 1, 2020, and ending Sep-7
tember 30, 2025,’’ and inserting ‘‘beginning on Oc-8
tober 1, 2020,’’; and 9
(2) in subsection (ee)(2), by striking ‘‘for the 10
period specified in such paragraph, if before the be-11
ginning of such period the State certifies to the sat-12
isfaction of the Secretary’’ and inserting ‘‘if such 13
State certifies, not less than every 5 years and to the 14
satisfaction of the Secretary,’’. 15
(b) C
ONFORMING AMENDMENT.—Section 16
1006(b)(4)(A) of the Substance Use-Disorder Prevention 17
that Promotes Opioid Recovery and Treatment for Pa-18
tients and Communities Act (42 U.S.C. 1396a note) is 19
amended by striking ‘‘, and before October 1, 2025’’. 20
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 16:42 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S3136.IS S3136