Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2123 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/04/2025

                    I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2123 
To amend the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the 
National Flood Insurance Program. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH14, 2025 
Mr. G
ARBARINOintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Financial Services 
A BILL 
To amend the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to 
reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘NFIP Extension Act 4
of 2025’’. 5
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF THE NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE 6
PROGRAM. 7
(a) F
INANCING.—Section 1309(a) of the National 8
Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:48 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2123.IH H2123
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 2123 IH
amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 1
‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 2
(b) P
ROGRAMEXPIRATION.—Section 1319 of the Na-3
tional Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is 4
amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 5
‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 6
(c) R
ETROACTIVEEFFECTIVEDATE.—If this Act is 7
enacted after March 14, 2025, the amendments made by 8
subsections (a) and (b) shall take effect as if enacted on 9
March 14, 2025. 10
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:48 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2123.IH H2123
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS