Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB54 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/30/2025

                    I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 54 
To direct the President to withdraw the United States from the Constitution 
of the World Health Organization, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY3, 2025 
Mr. B
IGGSof Arizona (for himself, Mr. LAMALFA, Mr. BURLISON, Ms. 
H
AGEMAN, Mr. MASSIE, Mr. CRANE, Mr. MOOLENAAR, Ms. MACE, Mr. 
H
IGGINSof Louisiana, Mr. NORMAN, Mr. OGLES, Ms. TENNEY, Mr. 
E
DWARDS, Mr. BRECHEEN, Mr. MCCORMICK, and Mrs. HARSHBARGER) 
introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on 
Foreign Affairs 
A BILL 
To direct the President to withdraw the United States from 
the Constitution of the World Health Organization, and 
for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘WHO Withdrawal 4
Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 18:55 Jan 28, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H54.IH H54
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 54 IH
SEC. 2. WITHDRAWAL OF UNITED STATES FROM THE CON-1
STITUTION OF THE WORLD HEALTH ORGANI-2
ZATION; PROHIBITION ON USE OF FUNDS. 3
Effective on the date of the enactment of this Act— 4
(1) the President shall withdraw the United 5
States from the Constitution of the World Health 6
Organization (62 Stat. 2679; 14 U.N.T.S 186); and 7
(2) no funds available to any Federal depart-8
ment or agency may used to provide for the partici-9
pation of the United States in the World Health Or-10
ganization or any successor organization. 11
SEC. 3. REPEAL OF THE ACT OF JUNE 14, 1948. 12
The Act of June 14, 1948 (Public Law 806–43; 62 13
Stat. 441; 22 U.S.C. 290 et seq.), providing for member-14
ship and participation by the United States in the World 15
Health Organization and authorizing an appropriation 16
therefor, is repealed. 17
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 18:55 Jan 28, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H54.IH H54
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS