Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB736 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/08/2025

                    I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 736 
To amend title 31, United States Code, to modify the deadline for filing 
beneficial ownership information reports for reporting companies formed 
or registered before January 1, 2024. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY24, 2025 
Mr. N
UNNof Iowa (for himself, Ms. DAVIDSof Kansas, Mr. EMMER, and Mr. 
D
AVISof North Carolina) introduced the following bill; which was re-
ferred to the Committee on Financial Services 
A BILL 
To amend title 31, United States Code, to modify the dead-
line for filing beneficial ownership information reports 
for reporting companies formed or registered before Jan-
uary 1, 2024. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Protect Small Busi-4
nesses from Excessive Paperwork Act of 2025’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:38 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H736.IH H736
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 736 IH
SEC. 2. MODIFICATION TO FILING DEADLINE FOR CERTAIN 1
PRE-EXISTING REPORTING COMPANIES. 2
Section 5336(b)(1)(B) of title 31, United States 3
Code, is amended by striking ‘‘before the effective date 4
of the regulations prescribed under this subsection shall, 5
in a timely manner, and not later than 2 years after the 6
effective date of the regulations prescribed under this sub-7
section,’’ and inserting ‘‘before January 1, 2024, shall, not 8
later than January 1, 2026,’’. 9
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:38 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H736.IH H736
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS