IV 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. RES. 140 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Education and Workforce in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FEBRUARY14, 2025 Mr. W ALBERG(for himself and Mr. SCOTTof Virginia) submitted the fol- lowing resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Admin- istration RESOLUTION Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Education and Workforce in the One Hundred Nine- teenth Congress. Resolved, 1 SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2 For the expenses of the Committee on Education and 3 Workforce (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the 4 ‘‘Committee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, 5 there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the 6 House of Representatives for committee salaries and ex-7 penses, not more than $22,033,322.00 for the One Hun-8 dred Nineteenth Congress. 9 VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:42 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR140.IH HR140 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •HRES 140 IH SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1 Of the amount specified in section 1— 2 (1) not more than $10,979,883.00 shall be 3 available for expenses incurred during the period be-4 ginning at noon on January 3, 2025, and ending im-5 mediately before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6 (2) not more than $11,053,439.00 shall be 7 available for expenses incurred during the period be-8 ginning at noon on January 3, 2026, and ending im-9 mediately before noon on January 3, 2027. 10 SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11 Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12 vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13 Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14 directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15 SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16 Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17 be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18 the Committee on House Administration. 19 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:42 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR140.IH HR140 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS