Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR217 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 217 
Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America on its 113th birthday 
and celebrating its founder Juliette Gordon Low and the legacy of 
providing girls with a secure and inclusive space where they can explore 
their world, build meaningful relationships, and have access to experi-
ences that prepare them for a life of leadership. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH11, 2025 
Mrs. K
IM(for herself, Mrs. WATSONCOLEMAN, Ms. MCCOLLUM, Ms. 
M
ALLIOTAKIS, Ms. WILLIAMSof Georgia, Ms. SCANLON, Mr. 
G
ARBARINO, and Mr. CARTERof Georgia) submitted the following resolu-
tion; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government 
Reform 
RESOLUTION 
Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America 
on its 113th birthday and celebrating its founder Juliette 
Gordon Low and the legacy of providing girls with a 
secure and inclusive space where they can explore their 
world, build meaningful relationships, and have access 
to experiences that prepare them for a life of leadership. 
Whereas March 12, 2025, marks the 113th anniversary of 
Girl Scouts of the United States of America, whose mis-
sion is to ‘‘build girls of courage, confidence, and char-
acter, who make the world a better place’’; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 217 IH 
Whereas Girl Scouts offers girls 21st century programming 
in science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM), 
the outdoors, entrepreneurship, and beyond, helping girls 
develop invaluable life skills through the Girl Scout Lead-
ership Experience; 
Whereas, today, more than 50,000,000 women—trailblazers, 
visionaries, and leaders—are Girl Scout alums who em-
body the Girl Scout mission every day; 
Whereas the Girl Scout movement began on March 12, 1912, 
when Juliette ‘‘Daisy’’ Gordon Low, a native of Savan-
nah, Georgia, organized a group of 18 girls and provided 
them with the opportunity to develop physically, intellec-
tually, socially, and spiritually; 
Whereas public service and civic engagement were a corner-
stone of Juliette Gordon Low’s life and remain an impor-
tant part of today’s Girl Scout experience, with program-
ming designed to encourage girls to seek opportunities to 
learn about Federal, State, and local government, re-
search and engage with their elected officials, and inspire 
girls to become civically minded individuals equipped with 
the tools to make a positive change in the world; 
Whereas Girl Scouts’ commitment to getting girls outdoors, 
including exciting summer camp experiences, comes from 
Juliette Gordon Low’s lifelong appreciation for nature 
and the environment; 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low utilized her extensive network 
of friends across the country and around the world to es-
tablish the foundation for the Girl Scout movement, cre-
ating opportunities for girls to form lifelong friendships 
with fellow Girl Scouts; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 217 IH 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low believed in the power of global 
connections and the ability of Girl Guides and Girl 
Scouts to positively impact their communities and the 
world, serving as the movement’s worldwide ambassador 
and first Girl Scout Global Citizen; 
Whereas, on March 25, 2025, the Juliette Gordon Low Com-
memorative Quarter will be released into circulation by 
the United States Mint, celebrating the enduring legacy 
of the Girl Scout founder and the Girl Scout movement; 
and 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low’s journey from trailblazing 
leader to a face on our Nation’s currency is a testament 
to the power of girls and women everywhere: Now, there-
fore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) recognizes Girl Scouts of the United States 2
of America for 113 years of building girls of cour-3
age, confidence, and character, who make the world 4
a better place; 5
(2) congratulates all Girl Scouts who earned the 6
Gold Award in 2024; 7
(3) commemorates the trailblazing founder of 8
Girl Scouts of the United States of America, Juliette 9
Gordon Low, for making her mark on American cur-10
rency; and 11
(4) encourages Girl Scouts of the United States 12
of America to continue to champion the ambitions, 13
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HRES 217 IH 
nurture the creativity, and support the talents of fu-1
ture women leaders. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB