Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR260 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/28/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 260 
Designating March 27, 2025, as ‘‘National Women in Agriculture Day’’. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH27, 2025 
Mrs. C
AMMACK(for herself, Ms. CRAIG, Mr. THOMPSONof Pennsylvania, Mr. 
P
ANETTA, Mr. BISHOP, Ms. DAVIDSof Kansas, Ms. PINGREE, Ms. 
B
ROWN, Ms. TOKUDA, Mr. AUSTINSCOTTof Georgia, Mr. MESSMER, 
Mr. N
UNNof Iowa, Ms. DELACRUZ, Mr. DAVISof North Carolina, Mr. 
S
ORENSEN, Mr. CRAWFORD, Mr. RILEYof New York, and Mr. MOORE 
of Alabama) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Agriculture 
RESOLUTION 
Designating March 27, 2025, as ‘‘National Women in 
Agriculture Day’’. 
Whereas the United States proudly recognizes agriculture as 
one of the most impactful industries of the United States 
and acknowledges the countless women who help agri-
culture prosper both in the United States and abroad; 
Whereas there are more than 1,200,000 female agricultural 
producers in the United States, making up more than 
1
⁄3 
of the agricultural producers in the United States; 
Whereas, in 2022, farms operated by women in the United 
States sold $222,000,000,000 in agricultural products, 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:58 Mar 27, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR260.IH HR260
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 260 IH 
accounting for 36 percent of the total agriculture sales in 
the United States for that year; 
Whereas, in addition to leading farming operations, women 
working in agriculture make a difference across the 
United States in various commodity and industry fields, 
including research and development, manufacturing, sales 
and distribution, agricultural education, agribusiness, and 
advocacy, which extend benefits to individuals across the 
globe through the international trade of the United 
States; 
Whereas the United States recognizes that women are vital 
in fostering the next generation of the agricultural work-
force by promoting science, technology, engineering, 
mathematics, and agricultural education and entrepre-
neurial and community initiatives by serving as mentors 
for the 4–H Program, the National FFA Organization, 
the Cooperative Extension System, and numerous post-
secondary agricultural science educator programs; 
Whereas March is National Women’s History Month; and 
Whereas female professionals, instructors, and leaders in the 
agricultural field should be celebrated for their efforts 
during National Ag Week, which takes place between 
March 23 and March 29, 2025: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) recognizes the important role of women in 2
agriculture as producers, educators, leaders, men-3
tors, and more; and 4
(2) encourages all citizens to— 5
(A) recognize women working in agri-6
culture; and 7
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:58 Mar 27, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR260.IH HR260
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 260 IH 
(B) praise the significant positive impact 1
those women have on the food resources and 2
the agricultural workforce of the United States 3
by encouraging and empowering women to— 4
(i) enter the agricultural field, which 5
is a high-demand field of work; 6
(ii) cultivate opportunities to lead; and 7
(iii) feed a hungry world. 8
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:58 Mar 27, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR260.IH HR260
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB