IV 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. RES. 295 Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard National Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign Terrorist Organizations. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES APRIL7, 2025 Mr. C RANK(for himself, Mr. TIFFANY, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. GUEST, and Mrs. B IGGSof South Carolina) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary RESOLUTION Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard National Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign Terrorist Organizations. Whereas, on January 20, 2025, President Trump issued Ex- ecutive Order 14157, designating cartels and other orga- nizations as Foreign Terrorist Organizations (FTOs) and Specially Designated Global Terrorists (SDGTs); Whereas Tren de Aragua (TdA), who has been directed to at- tack U.S. law enforcement officers, was specifically named as a FTO under this Executive order; Whereas in early February 2025, President Bukele met with Secretary of State Marco Rubio and agreed to imprison members of Tren de Aragua of behalf of the United States; VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •HRES 295 IH Whereas, on March 15, 2025, President Trump invoked the Alien Enemies Act in response to the infiltration of the United States by Tren de Aragua; Whereas, on March 15, 2025, two flights carrying noncitizen members of Tren de Aragua and the Salvadoran gang MS–13 departed U.S. airspace; Whereas, on March 16, 2025, El Salvador President Nayib Bukele received these two flights and immediately trans- ferred the SDGTs into El Salvador’s Terrorism Confine- ment Center (CECOT) for detention. Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 (1) supports the President’s Action to remove 2 foreign terrorists under the Alien Enemies Act, 50 3 U.S.C. 21 et seq.; 4 (2) affirms that, as Commander in Chief, the 5 President has executive authority to detain, deport, 6 or restrict non-citizens from a Foreign Terrorist Or-7 ganization; and 8 (3) endorses the complete elimination of these 9 organizations from the United States to protect the 10 nation’s territory, safety, and security. 11 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS