Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR315 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/10/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 315 
Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 1866. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL9, 2025 
Mr. J
ACKSONof Illinois (for himself, Ms. TLAIB, Ms. CROCKETT, Ms. BROWN, 
Ms. G
ARCIAof Texas, Mr. KENNEDYof New York, Mr. FIELDS, Mr. 
T
HANEDAR, Ms. STEVENS, Mr. ESPAILLAT, and Ms. NORTON) submitted 
the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Ju-
diciary 
RESOLUTION 
Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act 
of 1866. 
Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was 
passed and enacted into law; 
Whereas this year marks the 159th anniversary of the Civil 
Rights Act of 1866; 
Whereas the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was the first Federal 
law to define citizenship and affirm that all citizens are 
equally protected by the law; 
Whereas the intent of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was to 
combat the attempted suppression of the Emancipation 
Proclamation; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 315 IH 
Whereas President Andrew Johnson established a reconstruc-
tion policy that forced former Confederate States to 
maintain abolition, swear loyalty to the United States, 
and pay their war debts in order to rejoin the Union; 
Whereas under President Johnson’s policy, Southern States 
adopted and enacted a series of laws designed to restrict 
freed Blacks and ensure their availability in the labor 
force; 
Whereas these laws severely denied Black citizens equal pro-
tection under the law; 
Whereas under restricted laws, Blacks were refrained from 
owning property, entering contracts, and benefiting from 
labor rights; 
Whereas a brave set of legislators believed the Federal Gov-
ernment had a role in shaping a multiracial society in 
postwar South; 
Whereas Senator Lyman Trumbull of Illinois introduced the 
Civil Rights Act of 1866 in the Senate on January 5, 
1866; 
Whereas, on February 2, 1866, the Senate voted in favor of 
the bill 33–13; 
Whereas, on March 13, 1866, the House of Representatives 
voted in favor of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 by a vote 
of 111–38, with 34 Members not voting; 
Whereas, on March 27, 1866, President Andrew Johnson ve-
toed the Civil Rights Act of 1866; 
Whereas, on April 6, 1866, the Senate voted 33–15 to over-
ride President Johnson’s veto; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 315 IH 
Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the House also voted to override 
President Johnson’s veto by a vote of 122–41 with 21 
Members not voting; and 
Whereas as a result of both Chambers voting to override 
President Johnson’s veto, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 
became the law of the land: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) recognizes the significance of the Civil 2
Rights Act of 1866 and its impact on establishing 3
that all Americans, despite their race, are protected 4
equally under the law; 5
(2) recognizes that the Civil Rights Act of 1866 6
is the framework from which the Thirteenth and 7
Fourteenth Amendments were crafted; and 8
(3) recognizes the importance of the rule of law 9
and advocates to support, protect, and defend the 10
rights of all Americans. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB