Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR356 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/29/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 356 
Expressing support for the designation of April 13, 2025, through April 
26, 2025, as ‘‘National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Week’’. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL28, 2025 
Ms. V
ELA´ZQUEZsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Education and Workforce 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing support for the designation of April 13, 2025, 
through April 26, 2025, as ‘‘National Young Audiences 
Arts for Learning Week’’. 
Whereas arts education, comprising a rich array of disciplines 
including dance, music, theater, media arts, literature, 
design, and visual arts, is an essential element of a com-
plete and well-rounded education for all students; 
Whereas arts education enables students to develop critical 
thinking and problem-solving skills, imagination and cre-
ativity, discipline, alternative ways to communicate and 
express feelings and ideas, and cross-cultural under-
standing, which supports academic success nationwide as 
well as personal growth outside the classroom; 
Whereas arts education provides a well-researched and proven 
methodology to differentiate instruction to meet the 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 356 IH 
needs of all students, especially for English language 
learners and students with special needs; 
Whereas the nonprofit arts sector is an economic engine and 
plays a significant role in the economic health of commu-
nities large and small with direct expenditures of wages 
and benefits as well as goods and services; 
Whereas, to succeed in today’s economy, students must mas-
terfully use words, images, sounds, and movement to 
communicate; 
Whereas Young Audiences Arts for Learning impacts over 
4,999,276 participants annually with valuable arts-in- 
education programs; 
Whereas Young Audiences Arts for Learning presents more 
than 87,170 arts-in-education programs to students and 
teachers; 
Whereas Young Audiences Arts for Learning works with 
55,335 school educators and teaching artists; 
Whereas Young Audiences Arts for Learning produces pro-
grams in more than 4,170 schools and community cen-
ters annually; 
Whereas Young Audiences Arts for Learning encompasses 30 
affiliates across the country, and the entire network of 
such affiliates is participating in the 2025 ‘‘National 
Young Audiences Arts for Learning Week’’; 
Whereas Young Audiences New York implemented over 200 
programs serving 22 partnering schools and institutions 
in all 5 boroughs of New York City, including 156 inte-
grated residency programs steeped in arts learning and 
arts integration practices in such areas as music, dance, 
visual and design arts, theater, media arts and tech-
nology in predominantly title I public school settings ex-
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 356 IH 
ploring teaching and learning pedagogy addressing the 
needs of all students; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Western New York partnered 
with schools and institutions impacting 17,122 student 
learners in 9 counties of western New York State inte-
grating the arts into such area as STEM, Language 
Arts, Social Studies, Character Education Environmental 
Awareness, Health and Nutrition; 
Whereas Arkansas Learning through the Arts delivered 151 
arts-integrated programs to more than 6,722 students 
across the State of Arkansas; 
Whereas Arts for Arts & Learning Conservatory joined the 
national Young Audiences Arts for Learning network last 
year in 2024 impacting 3,800 students throughout 
Southern California; 
Whereas Arts Education Collaborative, Pittsburgh, Pennsyl-
vania, delivered professional learning programs through-
out western Pennsylvania; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Connecticut worked with 124,129 
students in the State of Connecticut last year in 2024; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Indiana engaged 153 collabo-
rating partners to deliver arts-integrated programs to 
nearly 12,823 students in the State?; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Maryland partnered with nearly 
522 schools and community organizations in all 24 Mary-
land school districts to provide arts learning programs to 
215,269 participants from prekindergarten through grade 
12; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Miami provided more than 65 
programs reaching youth from infancy through high 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 
•HRES 356 IH 
school graduation, in collaboration with 77 partnering in-
stitutions; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Santa Cruz County, AZ, provided 
arts-based learning programs to 4,086 students through-
out Santa Cruz County; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Virginia served 38,425 students 
across the State of Virginia last year 2024; 
Whereas Arts Partners, Wichita, Kansas, provided over 2,486 
programs to 45,130 local students; 
Whereas ArtsNOW Learning in Atlanta, Georgia, partnered 
with 274 institutions throughout the Southeast United 
States involving over 31,088 participants; 
Whereas Center for Arts-Inspired Learning, in Cleveland, 
Ohio, provided nearly 6,689 programs for more than 
154,719 participants; 
Whereas Chicago Arts Partnerships in Education worked 
with 5,945 students in 60 Chicago Public Schools set-
tings; 
Whereas Kansas City Young Audiences in Missouri, the larg-
est nonprofit arts education provider in the region, served 
over 104,373 students; 
Whereas Springboard to Learning, in St. Louis, Missouri, de-
livered 4,415 programs to students in schools and com-
munity venues; 
Whereas Think 360 Arts for Learning, in Denver, Colorado, 
worked with more than 20,103 students across the State; 
Whereas Young Audiences New Jersey & Eastern Pennsyl-
vania provided programming to students throughout the 
region in collaboration with 600 schools and partnering 
organizations; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5 
•HRES 356 IH 
Whereas Young Audiences of Abilene reached approximately 
9,687 students last year in 2024; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Houston provided over 327 pro-
grams to more than 235,890 students; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Louisiana served more than 
33,017 learners including students, faculty and families 
at the Young Audiences Charter Schools in Jefferson and 
Orleans Parish; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Massachusetts reached approxi-
mately 147,211 students in the State of Massachusetts; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Northeast Texas brought qual-
ity arts in education experiences to nearly 64,814 learn-
ers in northeast Texas; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Northern California impacted 
over 44,417 students in the Bay Area this past year in 
2024; 
Whereas Arts for Learning Northwest partnered with 167 in-
stitutions to engage over 49,457 program participants 
across the region; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Southeast Texas partnered with 
schools throughout the region to deliver programming 
that integrates arts into all traditional areas of academic 
study to students in prekindergarten through grade 12; 
Whereas Young Audiences of Lubbock (Texas) joined the 
Young Audiences Arts for Learning national network in 
November 2022 and during its first year implemented 20 
programs in 19 schools; and 
Whereas April 13, 2025, through April 26, 2025, would be 
an appropriate period to designate as ‘‘National Young 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 6 
•HRES 356 IH 
Audiences Arts for Learning Week’’: Now, therefore, be 
it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) supports the designation of ‘‘National 2
Young Audiences Arts for Learning Week’’; 3
(2) honors and recognizes the contributions 4
which Young Audiences Arts for Learning programs 5
have made in enriching the lives of students, teach-6
ers, volunteers, families, and communities, and pays 7
tribute to arts in education and its contribution to 8
society; and 9
(3) encourages the people of the United States 10
to observe ‘‘National Young Audiences Arts for 11
Learning Week’’ with appropriate ceremonies and 12
activities that promote awareness of the role that 13
arts in education plays in enriching the education of 14
young people and enriching United States society as 15
a whole. 16
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 29, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR356.IH HR356
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS