Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR357 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/30/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 357 
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of State 
to transmit to the House of Representatives any record created on 
or after January 20, 2025, under the control of the President or the 
Secretary, respectively, relating to international agreements between the 
United States of America and El Salvador and the removal of individuals 
from the United States to El Salvador and subsequent detentions of 
such individuals. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL29, 2025 
Mr. C
ASTROof Texas submitted the following resolution; which was referred 
to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Sec-
retary of State to transmit to the House of Representa-
tives any record created on or after January 20, 2025, 
under the control of the President or the Secretary, 
respectively, relating to international agreements between 
the United States of America and El Salvador and the 
removal of individuals from the United States to El 
Salvador and subsequent detentions of such individuals. 
Resolved, That the President is requested, and the 1
Secretary of State is directed, to transmit, respectively, 2
to the House of Representatives, not later than 14 days 3
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:12 Apr 30, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR357.IH HR357
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 357 IH 
after the date of the adoption of this resolution, copies 1
of all documents, charts, or tables, including notes from 2
meetings, audio recordings, records (including telephone 3
and email records), correspondence, artificial intelligence 4
large language model conversation transcripts, and any 5
other communications created on or after January 20, 6
2025, under the control of the President or the Secretary, 7
respectively, that refer or relate to any of the following: 8
(1) Any agreements, including nonbinding in-9
struments, or arrangements made with the Govern-10
ment of El Salvador. 11
(2) All information pertaining to Secretary of 12
State Marco Rubio’s trip to El Salvador in February 13
2025, including preparation materials, transcripts, 14
and notes. 15
(3) All information pertaining to President 16
Bukele’s April 14, 2025, visit to the White House, 17
including preparation materials, transcripts, and 18
notes. 19
(4) All information regarding the removal of in-20
dividuals from the United States to El Salvador and 21
the detention of those individuals by the Government 22
of El Salvador, including on behalf of the United 23
States. 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:12 Apr 30, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR357.IH HR357
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 357 IH 
(5) All information pertaining to any funding 1
provided by the United States to the Government of 2
El Salvador to support the detention of individuals, 3
including information pertaining to the accounts 4
from which those funds are or will be drawn, 5
amounts already transferred, and amounts obligated 6
or committed to be transferred. 7
(6) Legal analysis of or legal justifications for 8
any agreements, including nonbinding instruments 9
with the Government of El Salvador, including any 10
and all analysis of whether such agreements are sub-11
ject to the requirements set forth in the Case-Za-12
blocki Act and amendments thereto included in PL 13
117–263. 14
(7) Legal analysis of or legal justifications for 15
any funding provided by the United States to the 16
Government of El Salvador to support the detention 17
of individuals, including any and all analysis of 18
whether such obligations of funding require notifica-19
tion to Congress. 20
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:12 Apr 30, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR357.IH HR357
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB