Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR64 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/24/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 64 
Affirming the alliance between the United States and the Republic of Korea. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY23, 2025 
Mr. S
UOZZIsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Affirming the alliance between the United States and the 
Republic of Korea. 
Whereas the United States and the Republic of Korea share 
an alliance based on the shared principles of democracy, 
human rights, and free markets; 
Whereas the partnership between the United States and the 
Republic of Korea is bound by shared interests and ce-
mented by a commitment to maintaining democratic in-
stitutions; 
Whereas the United States and the Republic of Korea work 
closely together to promote international peace and secu-
rity, economic prosperity, and the rule of law; 
Whereas the relationship between the United States and the 
Republic of Korea goes as far back as Korea’s Joseon 
Dynasty, when the United States and Korea established 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:11 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR64.IH HR64
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 64 IH 
diplomatic relations under the 1882 Treaty of Peace, 
Amity, Commerce, and Navigation; 
Whereas, on August 15, 1948, the Provisional Government of 
the Republic of Korea, established on April 11, 1919, was 
dissolved and transitioned to the First Republic of Korea, 
the first independent government; 
Whereas United States military personnel have maintained a 
continuous presence on the Korean Peninsula since the 
Mutual Defense Treaty Between the United States and 
the Republic of Korea was signed at Washington on Oc-
tober 1, 1953; 
Whereas the Treaty of Friendship, Commerce, and Naviga-
tion between the United States and the Republic of 
Korea, with Protocol (8 UST 2217) was signed in Seoul 
on November 28, 1956; 
Whereas the year 2025 marks the 80th anniversary of Ko-
rean liberation from colonial rule; 
Whereas the bilateral relationship between the United States 
and the Republic of Korea is one of the world’s most con-
sequential security and economic alliances; 
Whereas the bilateral relationship between the United States 
and the Republic of Korea promotes a free, open, secure, 
and prosperous Indo-Pacific; 
Whereas the Republic of Korea is one of the fastest growing 
sources of foreign direct investment in the United States; 
Whereas, in 2023, the Republic of Korea was the United 
States seventh-largest trading partner; 
Whereas United States goods and services exports to the Re-
public of Korea totaled $91,300,000,000 in 2023, and 
imports totaled $132,000,000,000; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:11 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR64.IH HR64
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 64 IH 
Whereas, in 2023, the stock of the Republic of Korea’s for-
eign direct investment in the United States was 
$76,700,000,000, and United States foreign direct in-
vestment to the Republic of Korea was $35,600,000,000; 
Whereas over 88,000 workers in the United States were em-
ployed by Republic of Korea multinational firms in 2021; 
Whereas, on January 13, 1903, 102 pioneer Korean immi-
grants arrived in the United States, initiating the first 
chapter of Korean immigration to America; 
Whereas the over 2,000,000 Korean Americans living in the 
United States contribute to the diversity and prosperity 
of the Nation, participate in all facets of American life, 
and have made significant contributions to the economic 
vitality of the United States; 
Whereas members of the Korean-American community serve 
with distinction in the United States Armed Forces; 
Whereas Korean Americans continue to build and strengthen 
the alliance between the United States and the Republic 
of Korea; 
Whereas the Asia Reassurance Initiative Act (Public Law 
115–409), signed into law on December 31, 2018, states 
that the United States Government— 
(1) is committed to the Mutual Defense Treaty Be-
tween the United States and the Republic of Korea and 
all related and subsequent bilateral security agreements 
and arrangements concluded on or before the date of en-
actment of that Act; 
(2) recognizes the vital role of the alliance between 
the United States and the Republic of Korea in pro-
moting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region; and 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:11 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR64.IH HR64
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 
•HRES 64 IH 
(3) calls for the strengthening and broadening of 
diplomatic, economic, and security ties between the 
United States and the Republic of Korea; and 
Whereas the United States and the Republic of Korea 
launched the Nuclear Consultative Group in 2023 to dis-
cuss how to plan for nuclear contingencies and cooperate 
on the Alliance’s approach to nuclear deterrence, thereby 
strengthening security in the Indo-Pacific: Now, there-
fore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) reaffirms the importance of the United 2
States-Republic of Korea alliance; 3
(2) highlights the importance of the United 4
States-Republic of Korea alliance to security in the 5
Indo-Pacific; 6
(3) underscores the need to continue strength-7
ening security, economic, and cultural ties; 8
(4) celebrates the important contributions of 9
Korean Americans to American society; and 10
(5) supports the goals of Korean Culture- 11
Kimchi Day. 12
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:11 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR64.IH HR64
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS