II 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION S. 1399 To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure appropriate payment of certain algorithm-based healthcare services under the Medi- care program. IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES APRIL9, 2025 Mr. R OUNDS(for himself, Mr. HEINRICH, and Mrs. BLACKBURN) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance A BILL To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure appropriate payment of certain algorithm-based healthcare services under the Medicare program. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Health Tech Invest-4 ment Act’’. 5 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 2 •S 1399 IS SEC. 2. ENSURING APPROPRIATE PAYMENT OF CERTAIN 1 ALGORITHM-BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICES 2 UNDER THE MEDICARE PROGRAM. 3 (a) I NGENERAL.—Section 1833(t) of the Social Se-4 curity Act (42 U.S.C. 1395l(t)) is amended— 5 (1) in paragraph (2)(E), by inserting ‘‘and new 6 technology ambulatory payment classification of al-7 gorithm-based healthcare services under paragraph 8 (16)(H)’’ after ‘‘(16)(G)’’; and 9 (2) in paragraph (16), by adding at the end the 10 following new subparagraph: 11 ‘‘(H) S PECIAL RULE FOR CERTAIN ALGO -12 RITHM-BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICES .— 13 ‘‘(i) I N GENERAL.—In the case of a 14 covered OPD service furnished on or after 15 January 1, 2026, that is an algorithm- 16 based healthcare service (as defined in 17 clause (ii)) that is assigned to a new tech-18 nology ambulatory payment classification 19 (as described in the final rule entitled 20 ‘Medicare Program; Changes to the Hos-21 pital Outpatient Prospective Payment Sys-22 tem for Calendar Year 2002’ published by 23 the Department of Health and Human 24 Services on November 30, 2001 (66 Fed. 25 Reg. 59897)) on or after the date of the 26 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 3 •S 1399 IS enactment of this subparagraph or for 1 which, as of such date, is currently and 2 has been assigned to a new technology am-3 bulatory payment classification for a pe-4 riod of less than 5 years, the Secretary— 5 ‘‘(I) shall ensure that such serv-6 ice is assigned to a new technology 7 ambulatory payment classification 8 based on the cost of such service as 9 submitted by the manufacturer of 10 such service in a form and manner 11 specified by the Secretary, including 12 costs for the technology based on in-13 voice prices, subscription-based prices, 14 clinical staff, overhead, and other 15 costs associated with providing the 16 service; 17 ‘‘(II) shall adjust the new tech-18 nology ambulatory payment classifica-19 tion pursuant to subclause (I) as nec-20 essary; and 21 ‘‘(III) may not remove such serv-22 ice from the new technology ambula-23 tory payment classification as deter-24 mined under subclauses (I) and (II) 25 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 4 •S 1399 IS until the Secretary determines that 1 adequate claims data exists to reas-2 sign such service to another ambula-3 tory payment classification (which in 4 no case may be before such service 5 has received payment under the as-6 signed new technology ambulatory 7 payment classification for at least 5 8 years). 9 ‘‘(ii) A DJUSTMENT.—The Secretary 10 shall adjust the application process and 11 criteria for the new technology ambulatory 12 payment classification to ensure that, in 13 addition to currently eligible algorithm- 14 based healthcare services, algorithm-based 15 healthcare services that otherwise meet the 16 eligibility requirements for such classifica-17 tion and are distinct from but performed 18 concurrently with, adjunctive to, or pro-19 vided in any other modality or form as 20 part of an underlying service and require 21 additional resources, meet— 22 ‘‘(I) the eligibility requirement 23 that they are distinct new procedures 24 with a beginning, middle, and end; or 25 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 5 •S 1399 IS ‘‘(II) any subsequent similar new 1 technology ambulatory payment classi-2 fication eligibility requirement. 3 ‘‘(iii) D EFINITION OF ALGORITHM - 4 BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICE .—For pur-5 poses of this subparagraph, the term ‘algo-6 rithm-based healthcare service’ means a 7 service delivered through a device cleared 8 or approved by the Food and Drug Admin-9 istration that uses artificial intelligence, 10 machine learning, or other similarly de-11 signed software to yield clinical outputs or 12 generate clinical conclusions for use by a 13 physician or practitioner in the screening, 14 detection, diagnosis, or treatment of an in-15 dividual’s condition or disease, or any such 16 other similar service as the Secretary de-17 termines appropriate in consultation with 18 appropriate organizations.’’. 19 (b) C ODIFYINGOPPS PAYMENT FORSOFTWARE AS 20 ASERVICE.—Effective for services provided on or after 21 January 1, 2023, the Secretary of Health and Human 22 Services shall apply the hospital outpatient prospective 23 payment system payment for software as a service policy 24 described in the final rule entitled, ‘‘Medicare Program: 25 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 6 •S 1399 IS Hospital Outpatient Prospective Payment and Ambulatory 1 Surgical Center Payment Systems and Quality Reporting 2 Programs; Organ Acquisition; Rural Emergency Hos-3 pitals: Payment Policies, Conditions of Participation, Pro-4 vider Enrollment, Physician Self-Referral; New Service 5 Category for Hospital Outpatient Department Prior Au-6 thorization Process; Overall Hospital Quality Star Rating; 7 COVID–19’’ published by the Department of Health and 8 Human Services on November 23, 2022 (87 Fed. Reg. 9 71748). 10 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB